Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1932288

EP1932288 - BUS CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ST-Ericsson SA
Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]For all designated states
ST-Ericsson SA
Chemin du Champ-des-Filles 39
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / LAMBRECHT, Xavier
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / VAN VLIMMEREN, Bernardus, A., C.
C/o Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Bird, William Edward , et al
Bird Goën & Co
Wetenschapspark Arenberg
Gaston Geenslaan 9
3001 Heverlee / BE
[N/P]
Former [2010/29]Bird, William Edward , et al
Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A
3020 Winksele / BE
Former [2009/13]Bird, William Edward , et al
Neuer Zollhof 2
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/09]Williamson, Paul Lewis , et al
NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill
Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
Former [2008/33]White, Andrew Gordon
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [2008/25]White, Andrew Gordon
NXP Semiconductors IP Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Application number, filing date06796012.013.09.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006IB53249
Priority number, dateEP2005010872521.09.2005         Original published format: EP 05108725
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007034368
Date:29.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1932288
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1932288
Date:03.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42
[2008/39]
Former International [2008/25]H04L12/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BUS-SCHALTUNG[2008/25]
English:BUS CIRCUIT[2008/25]
French:CIRCUIT DE BUS[2008/25]
Entry into regional phase21.04.2008National basic fee paid 
27.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
27.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/28]
19.08.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.12.2009Fee for grant paid
18.12.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
27.05.2009Request for further processing filed
27.05.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
27.05.2009Request for further processing filed
27.05.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IT03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
TR03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
HU04.09.2010
IE13.09.2010
LU13.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/44]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IT03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
HU04.09.2010
IE13.09.2010
LU13.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2012/42]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IT03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
HU04.09.2010
IE13.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/36]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IT03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
IE13.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/20]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IT03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/18]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
IT03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
Former [2011/09]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
DK03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
PT05.07.2010
Former [2011/05]AT03.03.2010
BE03.03.2010
CY03.03.2010
CZ03.03.2010
EE03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
RO03.03.2010
SE03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
SK03.03.2010
BG03.06.2010
GR04.06.2010
ES14.06.2010
IS03.07.2010
Former [2010/45]AT03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
NL03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
Former [2010/42]AT03.03.2010
FI03.03.2010
LT03.03.2010
LV03.03.2010
PL03.03.2010
SI03.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[A]US6597197  (MOSLEY DANIEL A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 9 *;
 [A]EP0693729  (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *