Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1896073

EP1896073 - ANTI-IL-23 ANTIBODIES, COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND USES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Biotech, Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
[2011/44]
Former [2009/33]For all designated states
Centocor Ortho Biotech Inc.
800/850 Ridgeview Drive
Horsham, PA 19044 / US
Former [2008/11]For all designated states
CENTOCOR, INC.
200 Great Valley Parkway
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BENSON, Jacqueline
5 Oak Glen Drive
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
02 / CUNNINGHAM, Mark
716 Garden Drive
Kennett Square, PA 19348 / US
03 / DUCHALA, Cynthia
6804 Colonial Court
North Wales, PA 19454 / US
04 / GILES-KOMAR, Jill M.
31 Blakely Road
Downingtown, PA 19335 / US
05 / LUO, Jinquan
46 Knickerbocker Lane
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
06 / RYCYZYN, Michael A.
507 Midland Avenue
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
07 / SWEET, Raymond
108 Edgehill Road
Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US
 [2008/11]
Representative(s)Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/10]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2008/11]Marshall, Cameron John
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date06800000.930.06.2006
[2008/11]
WO2006US26174
Priority number, dateUS20050695831P30.06.2005         Original published format: US 695831 P
[2008/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007005955
Date:11.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1896073
Date:12.03.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007
[2008/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1896073
Date:06.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US01.11.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, G01N33/567, C07H21/04, C12P21/06, C07K16/24
[2008/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/11]
Extension statesHR18.01.2008
TitleGerman:ANTI-IL-23-ANTIKÖRPER, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG[2008/11]
English:ANTI-IL-23 ANTIBODIES, COMPOSITIONS, METHODS AND USES[2008/11]
French:ANTICORPS ANTI-IL-23, COMPOSITIONS, MÉTHODES ET UTILISATIONS[2008/11]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2008National basic fee paid 
18.01.2008Search fee paid 
18.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/11]
17.11.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.08.2012Observations by third parties
02.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
14.11.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.12.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/02]
18.01.2013Fee for grant paid
18.01.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11190796.0  / EP2452694
EP18206005.3  / EP3501537
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  12.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Birkendorfer Strasse 65
88397 Biberach an der Riss / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  06.12.2013  11.07.2017  WITHDRAWN
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  06.12.2013  08.08.2018  WITHDRAWN
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
O'Connor, David, et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
Lilly research Centre
Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
 [2018/37]
Former [2017/33]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  12.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Birkendorfer Strasse 65
88397 Biberach an der Riss / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  06.12.2013  11.07.2017  WITHDRAWN
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 03  06.12.2013  10.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
O'Connor, David, et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
Lilly research Centre
Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
Former [2014/03]
Opponent(s)01  05.12.2013  12.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG
Birkendorfer Strasse 65
88397 Biberach an der Riss / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 02  06.12.2013   
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 03  06.12.2013   
Eli Lilly and Company
Lilly Corporate Center
Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US
Opponent's representative
O'Connor, David, et al
Eli Lilly and Company Limited
Lilly research Centre
Erl Wood Manor
Windlesham, Surrey GU20 6PH / GB
16.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
28.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
28.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition07.04.2016Appeal received No.  T0756/16
07.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0756/16
04.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
29.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0756/16
30.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/44]
06.03.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/11]
28.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
11.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
14.06.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY06.03.2013
TR06.03.2013
[2015/32]
Former [2013/52]CY06.03.2013
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2005137385  (BENSON JACQUELINE [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * page 2, paragraph 11 - page 15, paragraph 138; claim 28 *;
 [Y]WO2004081190  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * page 14, paragraph 44 - page 30, paragraph 93 *;
 [Y]WO2004042009  (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * page 7 - page 22 *;
 [Y]WO2004071517  (SCHERING CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP1072610  (CHUGAI RES INST MOLECULAR MED [JP]) [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - SEHY DAVID W ET AL, "Unambiguous Detection of IL-23 (p19/p40) Protein in Native Samples Using a Novel Enzyme-Linked Immunosorbent Assay", FASEB JOURNAL, FED. OF AMERICAN SOC. FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (20050301), vol. 19, no. 4, SUPPL. S/1, ISSN 0892-6638, pages A945 - A946, XP009080613 [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * abstract *
 [Y]  - OPPMANN B ET AL, "Novel p19 Protein Engages IL-12p40 to Form a Cytokine, IL-23, with Biological Activities Similar as Well as Distinct from IL-12", IMMUNITY, CELL PRESS, US, (20001101), vol. 13, no. 5, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 715 - 725, XP002903120 [Y] 1-3,14,18-22,24-40 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(00)00070-4
International search[Y]US6495667  (BAZAN J FERNANDO [US]);
 [Y]US2004223969  (OFT MARTIN [US], et al)
by applicantEP1072610
 US6495667
 US2005137385
 WO2004042009
 WO2004071517
 WO2004081190
 WO9916419
 US5447851
 US5116964
 US5225538
 US5851198
 US5839446
    - NURSING, Drug Handbook, (2001), pages 1098 - 1136
    - LESSLAUER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 22, pages 2883 - 2886
    - ASHKENAZI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10535 - 10539
    - PEPPEL ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1991), vol. 274, pages 1483 - 1489
    - KOLLS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 92, pages 215 - 219
    - BUTLER ET AL., CYTOKINE, (1994), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 616 - 623
    - BAKER ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 2040 - 2048
    - CAPON ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 337, pages 525 - 531
 US19950442133
otherWO2004071517
 WO2004081190
Opposition   - CHI et al., "broadly neutralizing anti-HBV antibody binds to non-epitope regions of pres1", FEBS Letters, (20090000), vol. 583, pages 3095 - 3100, XP026600813

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2009.08.030
    - WIKIPEDIA, Homology modeling
    - BAKER et al., Science, (20010000), vol. 294, no. 5540, pages 93 - 96
    - LUPARDUS et al., "the structure of interleukin 23 reveals the molecular basis of p40 subunit sharing with IL-12", Journal of Molecular Biology, (20080000), vol. 382, no. 4, pages 931 - 941, XP026805071

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmb.2008.07.051
    - BRADSHAW et al., Handbook of Cell Signaling, (20100000), vol. 1, no. 2nd ed., pages 97 - 101, XP055291156
    - COLEMAN, "virus versus antibody", Structure, (19970000), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 591 - 593, XP055291157

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-2126(97)00214-1
    - Priority document of D25
    - Priority document of the opposed patent (complete version
    - clark, "IL -23p19 [Homo sapiens", GenBank, (20030000), Database accession no. AAQ89442.1, XP055291163
    - CHEN et al., "anti-IL23 therapy inhibits multiple inflammatory pathways and ameliorates autoimmune encephalomyelitis", J Clin Invest., (20060000), vol. 116, no. 5, pages 1317 - 1326, XP002630082

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI25308
    - "Monoclonal Anti-human IL -23 antibody", R&D Systems, XP055291160
    - "Homology modeling", Wikipedia
    - "IL -23p19 [Homo sapiens", genbank, (20030000), Database accession no. AAQ89442.1, URL: ncbi, XP055291161