blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1931854 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1931854



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 510
16.08.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 2
03.05.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.11.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
23.12.2009 Claims Search / examination 7
23.12.2009 Description Search / examination 14
23.12.2009 Description Search / examination 3
23.12.2009 Description Search / examination 6
23.12.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
23.12.2009 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.12.2009 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
23.12.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
22.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 1
30.03.2009 Description Search / examination 2
30.03.2009 Description Search / examination 2
30.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.02.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.10.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
13.10.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.10.2008 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
22.09.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
11.06.2008 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
28.05.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
28.05.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
21.05.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
09.05.2008 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 5
08.05.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.04.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
18.04.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 4
16.04.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-entry into European phase) Search / examination 4
15.04.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
15.04.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
11.04.2008 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
31.03.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
27.02.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
19.12.2007 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
08.03.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 49
15.02.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
15.02.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 130