Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1931350

EP1931350 - ADMINISTRATION OF DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.10.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-0045 / JP
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / CHRISTOPHER, Ronald, J
1059 Snipe Court
Carlsbad, California 92011 / US
02 / COVINGTON, Paul
3116 Braemar Lane
Wilmington, North Carolina 28409 / US
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Duncan, Garreth Andrew , et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2008/25]Duncan, Garreth Andrew , et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date06803523.713.09.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006US35708
Priority number, dateUS20050717558P14.09.2005         Original published format: US 717558 P
US20060747273P15.05.2006         Original published format: US 747273 P
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007033266
Date:22.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1931350
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1931350
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/513, A61K31/44, A61K31/131, A61P3/10
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesAL28.03.2008
BA28.03.2008
HR28.03.2008
MK28.03.2008
RS28.03.2008
TitleGerman:VERABREICHUNG VON DIPEPTIDYL-PEPTIDASE-HEMMERN[2008/25]
English:ADMINISTRATION OF DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE INHIBITORS[2008/25]
French:ADMINISTRATION D'INHIBITEURS DE DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE[2008/25]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2008National basic fee paid 
28.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
18.12.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.10.2013Fee for grant paid
14.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.12.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.08.2014  25.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [2019/37]
Former [2014/39]
Opponent(s)01  20.08.2014   
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys, et al
Sohnckestrasse 12
81479 München / DE
15.10.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.04.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.04.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.04.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition17.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1427/16
12.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
10.06.2016Appeal received No.  T1427/16
11.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2005016911  (SYRRX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-97 * paragraphs [0107] , [0243] , [0317] *;
 [PX]WO2005095381  (SYRRX INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-97 * paragraphs [0182] , [0186] , [0298] , [0325] *
ExaminationEP1586571
by applicantUS6057316
 US6001867
 WO9958518
 WO9958522
 WO9946268
 WO9946267
 WO9946244
 WO9946237
 WO9946236
 WO9915529
 WO0014090
 WO9940062
 WO9840385
 EP0682024
 WO0014095
 WO9947549
 WO9839344
 WO9839343
 WO9839342
 US5998463
 WO9926659
 WO9731901
 WO9639384
 WO9639385
 EP0978279
 EP0846464
 US5880139
 US5776954
 WO9901423
 WO9822109
 WO9822108
 WO9821957
 WO9716442
 WO9804528
 US6030837
 WO0021927
 WO9741854
 US4981784
 US5071773
 US5298429
 US5506102
 WO8905355
 WO9106677
 WO9205447
 WO9311235
 WO9518380
 WO9423068
 WO9323431
 US5705515
 WO9929672
 WO9832753
 WO9820005
 WO9809625
 WO9746556
 WO9737646
 WO9908501
 US5866563
 US5120712
 US5118666
 US5512549
 WO9111457
 US7056886
 WO0053208
 WO0149314
 WO03099854
 WO0078726
 EP0196222
 EP0526171
 EP0147850
 EP0207331
 US5488510
 US4062950
 EP0226121
 WO0114372
 WO9710224
    - MOL. CELL. ENDOCRINOL., (1997), vol. 135, no. 1, pages 67 - 77
    - DIABETES, (1998), vol. 47, pages 1630 - 1636
    - BIOORG MED. CHEM. LETT, (1992), vol. 2, pages 915 - 918
    - J. MED. CHEM., (1998), vol. 41, pages 5150 - 5157
    - J. BIOL CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 8694 - 8697
    - MOL. BIOL. DIABETES, (1994), vol. 2, pages 283 - 99
    - J. MED. CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 2741 - 2746
    - VIDAL-PUIG ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1997), vol. 235, no. 1, pages 79 - 82
    - DIABETES, (2000), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 759 - 767
    - J. PHARMACOL. EXP. THER., (1996), vol. 278, pages 82 - 89
    - J. CLIN. ENDOCRINOL. METAB., (2000), vol. 85, no. 3, pages 1043 - 1048
    - DIABETES CARE, (1998), vol. 21, pages 897 - 893
    - DIABETOLOGIA, (1996), vol. 39, pages 492 - 499
    - DIABETES, (1987), vol. 36, pages 216 - 220