Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1955228

EP1955228 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING CARDIAC OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARC Seibersdorf Research GmbH
Donau-City-Strasse 1
1220 Wien / AT
[2008/33]
Inventor(s)01 / WASSERTHEURER, Siegfried
8344 Bad Gleichenberg 288 / AT
02 / MAYER, Christopher
Steingasse 15/6
A-1030 Wien / AT
 [2008/33]
Representative(s)Keschmann, Marc , et al
Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH
Schottengasse 3a
1010 Wien / AT
[2013/28]
Former [2008/33]Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte OG
Schottengasse 3a
1014 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date06804383.508.11.2006
[2008/33]
WO2006AT00457
Priority number, dateAT2005000181808.11.2005         Original published format: AT 18182005
[2008/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007053868
Date:18.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1955228
Date:13.08.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2007
[2008/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2008/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES HERZZEITVOLUMENS[2008/33]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING CARDIAC OUTPUT[2008/33]
French:PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LE DEBIT CARDIAQUE[2008/33]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2008National basic fee paid 
07.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.11.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/33]
19.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.08.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
03.08.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination22.09.2017Appeal received No.  T0161/18
01.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.08.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
23.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
10.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9212669  (TNO [NL]) [X] 1-13 * page 5, line 4 - line 17 * * page 5, line 37 - page 10, line 30 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 9 *;
 [X]US2002028998  (CHESNEY CHARLES F [US] ET AL) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [A]US5339818  (BAKER PHILLIP D [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 31 * * column 5, line 30 - column 10, line 10 * * column 10, line 22 - column 11, line 63 *;
 [A]US6186955  (BAURA GAIL D [US]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 50 * * column 5, line 65 - column 7, line 12 * * column 7, line 18 - column 8, line 15 * * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 42 * * column 9, line 52 - column 11, line 59 *;
 [X]  - WESSELING K H ET AL, "COMPUTATION OF AORTIC FLOW FROM PRESSURE IN HUMANS USING A NONLINEAR, THREE-ELEMENT MODEL", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, US, (1993), vol. 74, no. 5, ISSN 8750-7587, pages 2566 - 2573, XP008072952 [X] 1-13 * page 2566, column L, line 28 - page 2568, column R, line 34 * * page 2569, column R, line 39 - page 2570, column R, line 14 *
 [A]  - BOGERT LYSANDER W J ET AL, "Non-invasive pulsatile arterial pressure and stroke volume changes from the human finger.", EXPERIMENTAL PHYSIOLOGY JUL 2005, (200507), vol. 90, no. 4, ISSN 0958-0670, pages 437 - 446, XP002441094 [A] 1-13 * page 440, column R, line 1 - page 442, column R, line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1113/expphysiol.2005.030262
 [A]  - SIEBENHOFER A ET AL, "The reproducibility of central aortic blood pressure measurements in healthy subjects using applanation tonometry and sphygmocardiography.", JOURNAL OF HUMAN HYPERTENSION SEP 1999, (199909), vol. 13, no. 9, ISSN 0950-9240, pages 625 - 629, XP002441096 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *