Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1952332

EP1952332 - TRIGGER SYSTEM FOR MONITORING AND/OR CONTROL DEVICES AND/OR EARLY WARNING SYSTEMS FOR NASCENT AND/OR OCCURRING CYCLONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.06.2009
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
09.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Swiss Reinsurance Company Ltd.
Mythenquai 50/60
8022 Zürich / CH
[2011/37]
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
Swiss Reinsurance Company
Mythenquai 50/60
8022 Zurich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BRESCH, David
Freiestrasse 135
CH-8032 Zürich / CH
02 / HECK, Pamela
Froburgstrasse 1a
CH-4410 Liestal / CH
03 / WUNDERLICH, Stefan
Ebmattstrasse 5
CH-8608 Bubikon / CH
 [2008/32]
Representative(s)Leimgruber, Fabian Alfred Rupert , et al
ThomannFischer
Elisabethenstrasse 30
4010 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Buntz, Gerhard , et al
ThomannFischer
Elisabethenstrasse 30
4010 Basel / CH
Former [2009/31]Braun, André jr.
Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 Postfach
4015 Basel / CH
Former [2008/32]Braun, André jr.
Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22
CH-4054 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date06804865.110.11.2006
[2008/32]
WO2006CH00633
Priority number, dateWO2005CH0067915.11.2005         Original published format: PCT/CH2005/000679
[2008/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007056880
Date:24.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1952332
Date:06.08.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06Q40/00, G01W1/10
[2008/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/32]
TitleGerman:TRIGGERVORRICHTUNG FÜR KONTROLLVORRICHTUNGEN UND/ODER STEUERVORRICHTUNGEN UND/ODER FRÜHWARNSYSTEME FÜR AUFKOMMENDE UND/ODER SICH EREIGNENDE WIRBELSTÜRME[2008/32]
English:TRIGGER SYSTEM FOR MONITORING AND/OR CONTROL DEVICES AND/OR EARLY WARNING SYSTEMS FOR NASCENT AND/OR OCCURRING CYCLONES[2008/32]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DECLENCHEMENT POUR DES DISPOSITIFS DE CONTROLE ET/OU DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMANDE ET/OU DES SYSTEMES D'ALERTE PRECOCE POUR DES CYCLONES QUI SONT EN TRAIN D'ARRIVER ET/OU D'APPARAITRE[2008/32]
Entry into regional phase16.06.2008National basic fee paid 
16.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.05.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
19.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2013Date of oral proceedings
08.01.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination24.01.2014Appeal received No.  T1499/14
15.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
25.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.01.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
30.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
02.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]US6023223  (BAXTER JR JOHN FRANCIS [US]) [X] 1-41 * abstract * * column 3 - column 6 *;
 [X]US2003004780  (SMITH MICHAEL R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-41 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] - [0050] , [0051] , [0065] - [0074] *;
 [X]WO2005083471  (SWISS REINSURANCE COMPANY [CH]; BRESCH DAVID N [CH]; HECK PAMELA [CH];) [X] 1-41 * abstract * * page 4 - page 10 *;
 [X]US2005216386  (KLUGMAN JUDITH [US]) [X] 1-41 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0013] - [0033] - [0035] *;
 [X]EP1583013  (SWISS REINSURANCE COMPANY [CH]) [X] 1-41 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0039] *;
 [A]  - MARK DEMARIA, JOHN KNAFF, JULIE DEMUTH, RAYMOND ZEHR, AND JACK DOSTALEK, "CIRA Contributions to the Joint Hurricane Testbed", CIRA BRINGING SCIENCE ALIVE - CIRA'S ROLE IN S.O.S., vol. 21, no. Spring'05, (200504), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://www.cira.colostate.edu/publications/newsletter/spring2005.pdf, (20070123), XP002416262 [A] 1-41 * page 7 - page 8 *