Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1954074

EP1954074 - TERMINAL MEASURE METHOD AND USER TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/32]A METHOD FOR PROCESSING CELL RESELECTION, TERMINAL MEASURE METHOD AND USER TERMINAL
[2010/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.03.2012
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YIN, Liyan
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2008/32]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date06805183.808.11.2006
[2008/32]
WO2006CN02986
Priority number, dateCN2005111767508.11.2005         Original published format: CN200510117675
[2008/32]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007054019
Date:18.05.2007
Language:ZH
[2007/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1954074
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1954074
Date:11.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/06
[2010/33]
Former International [2008/32]H04Q7/28
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/32]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ENDGERÄTEMESSVERFAHREN UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT[2010/37]
English:TERMINAL MEASURE METHOD AND USER TERMINAL[2010/37]
French:PROCEDE DE MESURE DE TERMINAL ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR[2010/37]
Former [2008/32]VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN DER ZELLENNEUAUSWAHL, ENDGERÄTEMESSVERFAHREN UND BENUTZERENDGERÄT
Former [2008/32]A METHOD FOR PROCESSING CELL RESELECTION, TERMINAL MEASURE METHOD AND USER TERMINAL
Former [2008/32]METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE RESELECTION DE CELLULE, PROCEDE DE MESURE DE TERMINAL ET TERMINAL UTILISATEUR
Entry into regional phase06.06.2008Translation filed 
09.06.2008National basic fee paid 
09.06.2008Search fee paid 
09.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
16.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2011Fee for grant paid
28.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
HU11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
IE08.11.2011
LU08.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
TR11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
IE08.11.2011
LU08.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/29]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
BG11.08.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
IE08.11.2011
LU08.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/25]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
IE08.11.2011
LU08.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2013/04]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
IE08.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/47]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
IE08.11.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/33]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/29]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
MC30.11.2011
Former [2012/24]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
IT11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/11]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
DK11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
PL11.05.2011
RO11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
SK11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2012/09]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
CZ11.05.2011
EE11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2012/01]AT11.05.2011
BE11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
NL11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/52]AT11.05.2011
CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
LV11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
SI11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
IS11.09.2011
PT12.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY11.05.2011
FI11.05.2011
LT11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
GR12.08.2011
ES22.08.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT11.05.2011
SE11.05.2011
PT12.09.2011
Former [2011/47]LT11.05.2011
PT12.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); User Equipment (UE) procedures in idle mode and procedures for cell reselection in connected mode (3GPP TS 25.304 version 6.7.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 125 304", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20050901), vol. 3-R2, no. V6.7.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014031922 [X] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph 5.2.3.1.2 * * paragraph 5.2.6 * [Y] 8-13
 [Y]  - SIEMENS, "Measurement requirements in conjunction with MBMS reception in different RRC states", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-040635, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20041111), vol. tsg_ran\WG4_Radio\TSGR4_33\Docs, no. Yokohama, Japan; 20041115, XP050173401 [Y] 8-13 * page 4, line 11 - line 28 *
 [Y]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Introduction of the Multimedia Broadcast Multicast Service (MBMS) in the Radio Access Network (Stage-2); (Release 6)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICALSPECIFICATION (TS), XX, XX, (20040201), vol. TS 25.346, no. V2.6.0, page 49pp, XP007902770 [Y] 8-13 * page 40, line 14 - line 28 *
International search[X]CN1404339  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [X]CN1464665  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN1177266  (MOTOROLA INC [US]);
 [A]EP1509056  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR])
Examination   - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); Requirements for support of radio resource management (FDD) (3GPP TS 25.133 version 6.12.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 125 133", ETSI STANDARDS, LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20051201), vol. 3-R4, no. V6.12.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014032538