Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1934144

EP1934144 - COMPOSITION FOR DESTROYING THREAD ALGAE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.09.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Söll GmbH
Fuhrmannstrasse 6
95030 Hof / DE
[2008/26]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLUWEIT, Thomas
Hausacker 24
95030 Wölbattendorf / DE
 [2008/26]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2010/26]Sandmann, Wolfgang , et al
Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Former [2010/17]Reynolds, Julian David , et al
Hammonds LLP 7 Devonshire Square
London EC2M 4YH / GB
Former [2010/15]Reynolds, Julian David , et al
Hammonds LLP Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7
80539 München / DE
Former [2010/14]Ascherl, Andreas , et al
Hammonds LLP Rechtsanwälte - Patentanwälte Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7
80539 München / DE
Former [2009/37]Schneider, Michael
Hammonds Karl-Scharnagel-Ring 7
80539 München / DE
Former [2009/15]Schneider, Michael
Hammonds LLP Karl-Scharnagl-Ring 7
80539 München / DE
Former [2008/26]Christophersen & Partner
Patentanwälte Feldstrasse 73
40479 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date06805377.606.10.2006
[2008/26]
WO2006DE01758
Priority number, dateDE2005104846007.10.2005         Original published format: DE102005048460
[2008/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007041992
Date:19.04.2007
Language:DE
[2007/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1934144
Date:25.06.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2007
[2008/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1934144
Date:16.06.2010
Language:DE
[2010/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.12.2007
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/50, A01K61/00, A01N1/00, C02F103/20, C02F1/72, C02F1/66
[2008/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERNICHTUNG VON FADENALGEN[2008/26]
English:COMPOSITION FOR DESTROYING THREAD ALGAE[2008/26]
French:COMPOSITION POUR DETRUIRE DES ALGUES FILAMENTEUSES[2008/26]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2008National basic fee paid 
02.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/26]
29.05.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.05.2010Fee for grant paid
03.05.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.03.2011  17.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Tetra GmbH
Herrenteich 78
49304 Melle / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB, et al
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 02  16.03.2011  23.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited
Dansom Lane
Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowers, Craig Malcolm
Reckitt Benckiser
Corporate Services Limited
Legal Department - Patents Group
Dansom Lane
Hull HU8 7DS / GB
 03  16.03.2011  23.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay SA
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Vande Gucht, Anne, et al
Solvay S.A.
Intellectual Assets Management
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/20]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2011  17.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Tetra GmbH
Herrenteich 78
49304 Melle / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner, et al
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
 02  16.03.2011  23.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited
Dansom Lane
Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowers, Craig Malcolm
Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane
Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB
 03  16.03.2011  23.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Solvay SA
Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Vande Gucht, Anne, et al
Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
Former [2011/16]
Opponent(s)01  11.03.2011  17.03.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Tetra GmbH
Herrenteich 78
49304 Melle / DE
Opponent's representative
Zimmermann & Partner, et al
Josephspitalstrasse 15
80331 München / DE
 02  16.03.2011   
Reckitt Benckiser (UK) Limited
Dansom Lane
Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB
Opponent's representative
Bowers, Craig Malcolm
Reckitt Benckiser Corporate Services Limited Legal Department - Patents Group Dansom Lane
Hull Humberside HU8 7DS / GB
 03  16.03.2011   
Solvay SA
Rue du Prince Albert, 33
1050 Brussels / BE
Opponent's representative
Vande Gucht, Anne, et al
Solvay S.A. Intellectual Assets Management Rue de Ransbeek, 310
1120 Bruxelles / BE
28.04.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.09.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.10.2012Date of oral proceedings
12.11.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
12.11.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
28.06.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/41]
17.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.01.2013Appeal received No.  T0080/13
12.03.2013Statement of grounds filed
28.06.2017Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
28.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH16.06.2010
CY16.06.2010
CZ16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
TR16.06.2010
BG16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
LU06.10.2010
IS16.10.2010
PT18.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
HU17.12.2010
[2017/51]
Former [2017/23]CY16.06.2010
CZ16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
TR16.06.2010
BG16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
LU06.10.2010
IS16.10.2010
PT18.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
HU17.12.2010
Former [2017/12]CY16.06.2010
CZ16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
TR16.06.2010
BG16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
LU06.10.2010
IS16.10.2010
PT18.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
HU17.12.2010
BE31.10.2016
Former [2013/42]CY16.06.2010
CZ16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
TR16.06.2010
BG16.09.2010
GR17.09.2010
LU06.10.2010
IS16.10.2010
PT18.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
HU17.12.2010
Former [2011/30]CY16.06.2010
CZ16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
IS16.10.2010
PT18.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2011/18]CY16.06.2010
CZ16.06.2010
EE16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
RO16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
SK16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
IS16.10.2010
PT18.10.2010
Former [2011/05]CY16.06.2010
FI16.06.2010
LT16.06.2010
LV16.06.2010
SI16.06.2010
GR17.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]NL1017129C  (RP ZEEWOLDE B V [NL]) [X] 1-6,9 * page 5, lines 32,33 *;
 [X]DE102004003286  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1-6,9 * table 1 *;
 [X]EP1557088  (A DEC INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9 * paragraph [0063] *;
 [X]US5855874  (GOPALKRISHNAN SRIDHAR [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6 * claim 5 *