blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2074603 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2074603



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 755
21.02.2017 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.01.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
19.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
05.01.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.01.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 6
04.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.01.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
31.08.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
25.08.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
20.06.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.2016 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
17.06.2016 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
17.06.2016 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
15.06.2016 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
10.06.2016 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
15.04.2016 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 3
15.04.2016 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 3
23.02.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
03.02.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.08.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
31.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
31.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
31.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
31.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
31.07.2015 Claims Appeal 3
31.07.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 25
03.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
20.05.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
31.03.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.03.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
30.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
20.03.2015 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 11
20.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
20.03.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
23.01.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
17.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
17.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.01.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.01.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
16.01.2015 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.12.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Lawyer) Opposition 1
02.12.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
29.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
26.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.11.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
20.11.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
20.11.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
20.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
20.11.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
21.10.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
23.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
23.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.09.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
23.09.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.09.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.09.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
19.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 3
19.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
19.09.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.09.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.09.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
19.09.2014 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
02.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
02.06.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
23.05.2014 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
04.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
31.03.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
31.03.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
31.03.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.03.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.09.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
24.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
11.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
11.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
08.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
08.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
08.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
08.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 74
08.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
08.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
08.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
08.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
04.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
04.02.2013 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
05.04.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
28.11.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.11.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.11.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.11.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 22
18.08.2009 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.06.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
04.06.2009 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
28.04.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.04.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.04.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.04.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 13
24.04.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
24.04.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
14.04.2009 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
14.04.2009 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
05.02.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
09.01.2009 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
09.01.2009 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2009 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2009 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.01.2009 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.01.2009 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.01.2009 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
09.01.2009 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
09.01.2009 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.05.2008 Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
02.05.2008 PCT(IB): Amended sheet (Article 19) PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
17.04.2008 Annex PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
17.04.2008 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.04.2008 Statement under Art. 19 PCT PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
07.04.2008 Free text PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.04.2008 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
07.04.2008 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
03.04.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
03.04.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 34
17.10.2007 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
17.10.2007 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
04.10.2007 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
18.10.2006 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
28.09.2006 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
28.09.2006 Claims PCT receiving Office 6
28.09.2006 Description PCT receiving Office 20
28.09.2006 Drawings PCT receiving Office 6