blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1917177 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1917177



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 132
09.12.2009 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.01.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.12.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.12.2008 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.12.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.12.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
16.10.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.10.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
16.10.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
16.10.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 16
15.09.2008 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.08.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
28.05.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
19.04.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.04.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
19.04.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
09.04.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 2
25.03.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
25.03.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 3
19.03.2008 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 6
07.03.2008 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.03.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
07.03.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.03.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
25.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 19
03.05.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
03.05.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
03.05.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 18
02.10.2006 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
02.10.2006 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
02.10.2006 Description PCT receiving Office 8
02.10.2006 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5