blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1917177


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2011  [2011/45]
30.09.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2011  [2011/44]
15.07.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2011  [2011/33]
29.04.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2011  [2011/22]
28.01.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2011  [2011/09]
31.12.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.02.2011  [2011/05]
28.05.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.06.2010  [2010/26]
12.03.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.04.2010  [2010/15]
25.12.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.01.2010  [2010/04]
11.12.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.01.2010  [2010/02]
02.01.2009 (Expected) grant published on  04.02.2009  [2009/06]
02.01.2009 Change - extension states published on  04.02.2009  [2009/06]
10.12.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.12.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.04.2008 Amendment by applicant
04.04.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  07.05.2008  [2008/19]
04.04.2008 Request for examination filed published on  07.05.2008  [2008/19]
15.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2006 PCT data prior to European publication