Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1917177

EP1917177 - SUPPORTING STRUCTURE IN THE FRONT REGION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HBPO GmbH
Rixbecker Strasse 75
59552 Lippstadt / DE
[2008/19]
Inventor(s)01 / KERSTING, Dirk
Niemöllerallee 26
59555 Lippstadt / DE
 [2008/19]
Representative(s)Heumann, Christian
Patentanwalt
Furtwänglerstrasse 91
70195 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/19]Heumann, Christian
Patentanwalt, Furtwänglerstrasse 91
70195 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date06805982.302.10.2006
[2008/19]
WO2006EP09537
Priority number, dateDE2005105166128.10.2005         Original published format: DE102005051661
[2008/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007048483
Date:03.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1917177
Date:07.05.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007
[2008/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1917177
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/08
[2008/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/19]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRAGSTRUKTUR IM FRONTBEREICH EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES[2008/19]
English:SUPPORTING STRUCTURE IN THE FRONT REGION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE[2008/19]
French:STRUCTURE PORTEUSE DISPOSEE DANS LA PARTIE AVANT D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2008/19]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2008National basic fee paid 
07.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/19]
19.04.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2008Fee for grant paid
02.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
TR04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
AT02.10.2009
LU02.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
AT02.10.2009
LU02.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/22]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
AT02.10.2009
LU02.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/09]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
AT02.10.2009
BE31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2011/05]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
BE31.10.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/26]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
MC31.10.2009
Former [2010/15]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/04]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
FI04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Cited inInternational search[X]US4287961
 [A]EP1055535
 [XP]EP1619089
 [X]EP0908374
 [X]EP0908373
by applicant DE69912263T
  US6685258
  DE4142023
  DE3922814