Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2074696

EP2074696 - ANALOGUE-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER APPARATUS AND METHOD OF REUSING AN ANALOGUE-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP USA, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin TX 78735 / US
[2017/33]
Former [2016/50]For all designated states
NXP USA, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive
Austin TX 78735 / US
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
6501 William Cannon Drive West
Austin, TX 78735 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BANNON, Alan
136 Bracken Court
Donnybrook
Douglas
Cork / IE
02 / DUNNE, Anthony
1 Shrewsbury
Carrigaline, Cork / IE
03 / MILLER, Matthew R
733 N Evergreen Avenue
Arlington Heights, Illinois 6004 / US
04 / O'HARE, Daniel
3a Old Blackrock Road
Cork / IE
05 / OLIAEI, Omid
165 W.Calle de Caballos - Tempe
AZ 85284 / US
 [2017/33]
Former [2009/33]01 / BANNON, Alan
136 Bracken Court Donnybrook Douglas
Cork / IE
02 / DUNNE, Anthony
1 Shrewsbury
Carrigaline, Cork / IE
03 / MILLER, Matthew R
733 N Evergreen Avenue
Arlington Heights, Illinois 6004 / US
04 / O'HARE, Daniel
3a Old Blackrock Road
Cork / IE
05 / OLIAEI, Omid
165 W.Calle de Caballos - Tempe
AZ 85284 / US
Former [2009/27]01 / BANNON, Alan
136 Bracken Court Donnybrook Douglas
Cork / IE
02 / DUNNE, Anthony
1 Shrewsbury
Carrigaline, Cork / IE
03 / MILLER, Matthew R
733 N Evergreen Avenue
Arlington Heights, Illinois 6004 / US
04 / O'HARE, Daniel
3a Old Blackrock Road
Cork / IE
05 / OLIAEI, Omid
University of Massachusetts Amherst 215A Marcus Hall 100 Natural Resources Road
Amherst, Massachusetts 01003-9292 / US
Representative(s)Pomper, Till
NXP Semiconductors
Intellectual Property Group
134 avenue Eisenhower
BP 72329
31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/33]Freescale law department - EMEA patent ops
NXP Semiconductors
134 avenue du Général Eisenhower
BP 72329
31023 Toulouse Cedex 1 / FR
Former [2012/24]Ferro, Frodo Nunes , et al
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.
c/o Optimus Patents Limited
Grove House
Lutyens Close, Chineham Court
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Former [2010/12]Ferro, Frodo Nunes , et al
Freescale Semiconductor, Inc. c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a, Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close, Andover
Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB
Former [2009/27]Ferro, Frodo Nunes
Impetus IP Limited Grove House, Lutyens Close Chineham
Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Application number, filing date06807261.013.10.2006
[2009/27]
WO2006EP67398
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008043397
Date:17.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2074696
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008
[2009/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2074696
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:H03M3/00
[2009/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2009/27]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANALOG-DIGITAL-UMSETZERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWENDUNG EINER ANALOG-DIGITAL-UMSETZERSCHALTUNG[2009/27]
English:ANALOGUE-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER APPARATUS AND METHOD OF REUSING AN ANALOGUE-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER CIRCUIT[2009/27]
French:APPAREIL CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE NUMÉRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉUTILISATION D'UN CIRCUIT CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE À NUMÉRIQUE[2017/23]
Former [2009/27]APPAREIL CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE À NUMÉRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉUTILISATION D'UN CIRCUIT CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE À NUMÉRIQUE
Entry into regional phase13.05.2009National basic fee paid 
13.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
04.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2017
15.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.07.2017Fee for grant paid
06.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.08.2009
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
IE13.10.2017
LU13.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
[2018/45]
Former [2018/39]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
LU13.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
LU13.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/35]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
LU13.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/26]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/23]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
Former [2018/09]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]US7116254  (NAGAI TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-19 * column 10, lines 31-36 - lines 55-62; figure 6 * [Y] 6,13;
 [Y]EP0954107  (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 6 * abstract *;
 [A]US2006119491  (GEALOW JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraph [0019] *;
 [A]US2004036640  (KAWAMURA AKINOBU [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *
 [Y]  - COPPEJANS P ET AL, "Continuous time quadrature band-pass &Delta", IEE PROCEEDINGS: CIRCUITS DEVICES AND SYSTEMS, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STENVENAGE, GB, (2002), vol. 149, no. 5-6, ISSN 1350-2409, pages 331 - 336, XP006019232 [Y] 6,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/ip-cds:20020585
 [A]  - STEPHEN A JANTZI ET AL, "Quadrature Bandpass Modulation for Digital Radio", IEEE JOURNAL OF SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199712), vol. 32, no. 12, ISSN 0018-9200, XP011060622 [A] 1-19 * paragraph [000C]; figures 9,10,13 *
ExaminationUS2003186671
 US2005191980
 WO0110035
by applicantUS7116254