Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2015851

EP2015851 - FROST RESISTANT CONTAINER FOR EXTINGUISHING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  03.04.2018
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2018Opposition rejectedpublished on 09.05.2018  [2018/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fogtec Brandschutz GmbH & Co. KG
Schanzenstrasse 19a
51063 Köln / DE
[2009/04]
Inventor(s)01 / SPRAKEL, Dirk
Hermann-Löns-Strasse 26
50996 Köln / DE
02 / LAKKONEN, Max
In der Schneekaule 11
51503 Rösrath / DE
 [2009/04]
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/38]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2009/04]Cohausz & Florack
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstraße 14
D-40211 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date06807657.930.10.2006
[2009/04]
WO2006EP67929
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008052593
Date:08.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2015851
Date:21.01.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008
[2009/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2015851
Date:22.09.2010
Language:DE
[2010/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A62C35/02, A62C35/68, E03B7/10
[2009/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/04]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FROSTSICHERER BEHÄLTER FÜR LÖSCHFLUID[2009/04]
English:FROST RESISTANT CONTAINER FOR EXTINGUISHING FLUID[2009/04]
French:RÉCIPIENT RÉSISTANT AU GEL POUR FLUIDE D'EXTINCTION[2009/04]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2008National basic fee paid 
11.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/04]
19.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2010Fee for grant paid
06.08.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.06.2011  06.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Minimax GmbH & Co. KG
Industriestr. 10/12
23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 31 02 60
80102 München / DE
 [2017/46]
Former [2012/50]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2011  06.07.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Minimax GmbH & Co KG
Industriestr. 10/12
23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE
Former [2011/30]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2011   
Minimax GmbH & Co KG
Industriestr. 10/12
23840 Bad Oldesloe / DE
Opponent's representative
Lüdtke, Frank
Patentanwalt Schildhof 13
30853 Langenhagen / DE
28.07.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
03.02.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.02.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
07.03.2013Date of oral proceedings
27.06.2013Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
27.06.2013Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.02.2018Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/19]
20.03.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition06.09.2013Appeal received No.  T1820/13
06.11.2013Statement of grounds filed
09.02.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
27.08.2013Appeal received No.  T1820/13
25.10.2013Statement of grounds filed
09.02.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in unamended form
09.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
26.02.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.09.2010
CZ22.09.2010
EE22.09.2010
FI22.09.2010
IE22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
NL22.09.2010
RO22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
SK22.09.2010
TR22.09.2010
LU30.10.2010
BE31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
BG22.12.2010
GB22.12.2010
GR23.12.2010
IS22.01.2011
PT24.01.2011
HU23.03.2011
DK31.10.2012
SE31.10.2012
[2013/48]
Former [2013/42]CY22.09.2010
CZ22.09.2010
EE22.09.2010
FI22.09.2010
IE22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
NL22.09.2010
RO22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
SK22.09.2010
TR22.09.2010
LU30.10.2010
BE31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
BG22.12.2010
GB22.12.2010
GR23.12.2010
IS22.01.2011
PT24.01.2011
HU23.03.2011
SE31.10.2012
Former [2013/34]BG22.09.2010
CY22.09.2010
CZ22.09.2010
EE22.09.2010
FI22.09.2010
IE22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
NL22.09.2010
RO22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
SK22.09.2010
TR22.09.2010
LU30.10.2010
BE31.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
GB22.12.2010
GR23.12.2010
IS22.01.2011
PT24.01.2011
HU23.03.2011
SE31.10.2012
Former [2011/29]CZ22.09.2010
EE22.09.2010
FI22.09.2010
IE22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
NL22.09.2010
RO22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
SK22.09.2010
MC31.10.2010
GR23.12.2010
IS22.01.2011
PT24.01.2011
Former [2011/23]CZ22.09.2010
EE22.09.2010
FI22.09.2010
IE22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
SK22.09.2010
GR23.12.2010
IS22.01.2011
Former [2011/19]FI22.09.2010
IE22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
GR23.12.2010
Former [2011/18]FI22.09.2010
LT22.09.2010
LV22.09.2010
SI22.09.2010
GR23.12.2010
Former [2011/09]LT22.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP0138195  (BAVARIA FEUERLOESCH APP [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0650743  (LINKE HOFMANN BUSCH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5058627  (BRANNEN WILEY W [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19723788  (PREUSSAG AG MINIMAX [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *