Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1945395

EP1945395 - PERFORATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 27.05.2015  [2015/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AIRBUS France
316, Route de Bayonne
31060 Toulouse / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
AIRBUS France
316 Route de Bayonne
31060 Toulouse / FR
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
Airbus France SAS
316, route de Bayonne
31060 Toulouse / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JANSON, Jean-Philippe
3, rue du Bac
80800 Le Hamel-Bouzencourt / FR
 [2008/30]
Representative(s)Stankoff, Hélène
Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Stankoff, Hélène
Santarelli, 14 avenue de la Grande Armée, BP237
75822 Paris Cédex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date06808105.811.09.2006
[2008/30]
WO2006FR02079
Priority number, dateFR2005000939114.09.2005         Original published format: FR 0509391
[2008/30]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007031631
Date:22.03.2007
Language:FR
[2007/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1945395
Date:23.07.2008
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007
[2008/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1945395
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:B23B47/34
[2008/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PERFORIERVORRICHTUNG[2008/30]
English:PERFORATING DEVICE[2008/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE PERÇAGE[2008/30]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2008National basic fee paid 
06.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/30]
19.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.12.2008Fee for grant paid
12.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
LU11.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
[2015/22]
Former [2011/44]AT25.02.2009
CY25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
TR25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
LU11.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/33]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
LU11.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/22]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
LU11.09.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2011/05]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/42]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
BE30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/20]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
Former [2010/15]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/04]AT25.02.2009
CZ25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
NL25.02.2009
PL25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
SI25.02.2009
SK25.02.2009
ES05.06.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US5342152  (MEDEKSZA LUDWIK A [US]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]EP1500780  (TOPF ERNST [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10109990  (LEEB FELIX [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE2436340  (VOEST AG) [A] 1-7 * figures 2,4,5 *;
 [A]DE19718275  (NAGEL MASCH WERKZEUG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 45 - line 55 *;
 [A]US2001020808  (SUZUKI HIDEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US4182588  (BURKART ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *