Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1931685

EP1931685 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING HIGHLY LUMINESCENT LANTHANIDE COMPLEXES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2012
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE
25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D"
75015 Paris / FR
[2008/25]
Inventor(s)01 / MAZZANTI, Marinella
1535 Chemin du Canet
F-38950 St Martin Le Vinoux / FR
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques , et al
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés
31, rue des Poissonceaux
CS 40009
59044 Lille Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/16]Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques , et al
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
Former [2008/25]Duthoit, Michel Georges André
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés, 96/98, Boulevard Carnot, B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date06808115.712.09.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006FR02089
Priority number, dateFR2005000944415.09.2005         Original published format: FR 0509444
[2008/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007031640
Date:22.03.2007
Language:FR
[2007/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1931685
Date:18.06.2008
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1931685
Date:03.08.2011
Language:FR
[2011/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07F5/00, G01N33/00
[2008/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesAL07.03.2008
BA07.03.2008
HR07.03.2008
MK07.03.2008
RS07.03.2008
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG STARK LUMINESZIERENDER LANTHANIDKOMPLEXE[2008/25]
English:METHOD FOR OBTAINING HIGHLY LUMINESCENT LANTHANIDE COMPLEXES[2008/25]
French:PROCEDE D'OBTENTION DE COMPLEXES DE LANTHANIDES HAUTEMENT LUMINESCENTS[2008/25]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2008National basic fee paid 
07.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
13.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
19.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2011Fee for grant paid
22.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2008
Opposition(s)04.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HU03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
LU12.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
BG03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
LU12.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
BG03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2013/29]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
LU12.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
BG03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2013/25]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
LU12.09.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2013/22]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/33]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/30]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
BE30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/23]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/21]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/20]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
IE03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
MC30.09.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/12]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/11]AT03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/09]FI03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/08]LT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
IS03.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]  PLATAS-IGLESIAS C, MATO-IGLESIAS M, DJANASHVILI K., MULLER R. N., VANDER ELST L., PETERS J. A., DE BLAS A., RODRÍGUEZ-BLAS T.: "Lanthanide Chelates Containing Pyridine Units with Potential Application as Contrast Agents in Magnetic Resonance Imaging" CHEMISTRY- A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, 2004, pages 3579-3590, XP002397229

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/chem.200306031
 [A]  CHATTERTON N., GATEAU C., MAZZANTI M., PÉCAUT J., BOREL A., HELM L., MERBACH A.: "The effect of pyridinecarboxylate chelating groups on the stability and electronic relaxation of gadolinium complexes" DALTON TRANSACTIONS, 2005, pages 1129-1135, XP002397230