Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1943835

EP1943835 - A METHOD FOR INDICATING SERVICE TYPES IN THE SERVICE GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.10.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
[2019/36]
Former [2015/32]For all designated states
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2014/24]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Karakaari 7
02610 Espoo / FI
Former [2008/29]For all designated states
Nokia Corporation
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / SEPPALA, Martta
11779 Stoney Peak Dr., 623
San Diego, CA 92128 / US
02 / PAILA, Toni
36A Cedar Place
Rye, NY 10580 / US
 [2008/29]
Representative(s)Anderson, Oliver Ben , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2013/30]
Former [2008/29]Johansson, Anna Olivia , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date06809159.426.10.2006
[2008/29]
WO2006IB03069
Priority number, dateUS2005026639904.11.2005         Original published format: US 266399
[2008/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007052128
Date:10.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1943835
Date:16.07.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007
[2008/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/445, H04N7/088
[2008/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ANGEBEN VON DIENSTTYPEN IN EINER DIENSTANLEITUNG[2008/29]
English:A METHOD FOR INDICATING SERVICE TYPES IN THE SERVICE GUIDE[2008/29]
French:PROCEDE D'INDICATION DES TYPES DE SERVICES DANS LE GUIDE DES SERVICES[2008/29]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2008National basic fee paid 
26.03.2008Search fee paid 
26.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/29]
20.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2013Date of oral proceedings
27.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.01.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination03.04.2014Appeal received No.  T1337/14
29.05.2014Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005188408  (WALLIS EMILY CLAIRE L [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-34 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0009] , [0029] - [0047] - [0056] - [0076] - [0084] , [0088]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [X]US6469753  (KLOSTERMAN BRIAN LEE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-34 * column 9, line 19 - column 9, line 34; figure 6b *
 [X]  - THE TV-ANYTIME FORUM, "THE TV-ANYTIME FORUM REQUIREMENTS SERIES: R-3 ON: METADATA REQUIREMENTS (NORMATIVE); document TV037r2", INTERNET CITATION, (20000407), URL: ftp://tva:tva ftp.bbc.co.uk/pub/Plenary/TV037r3.zip, (20060503), XP007900577 [X] 1-34 * pages 13-15,21 *
International search[X]US2005090235  ;
 [A]EP1355241