Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1949392

EP1949392 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTION AND PROTECTION OF ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMER AGAINST EXPLOSION AND FIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.09.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CTR Manufacturing Industries Limited
Nagar Road Poona
411 014 Maharashtra / IN
[2008/31]
Inventor(s)01 / WAKCHAURE, V., K.
CTR Manufacturing Industries Limited
Nagar Road
Poona 411 014
Maharashtra / IN
 [2011/42]
Former [2008/31]01 / WAKCHAURE, V., K.
CTR Manufacturing Industries Limited Nagar Road Poona 411 014
Maharashtra / IN
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/07]Neubeck, Wolfgang
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2009/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB
Former [2009/30]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds
LS1 5QX / GB
Former [2008/31]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5QX / GB
Application number, filing date06809902.713.04.2006
[2008/31]
WO2006IN00128
Priority number, dateIN2005MUM142516.11.2005         Original published format: IN MU14252005
[2008/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007057916
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1949392
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1949392
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01F27/14, H01F27/40, H02P13/00
[2008/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/31]
Extension statesAL09.11.2007
BA09.11.2007
HR09.11.2007
MK09.11.2007
YU09.11.2007
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION SOWIE ZUM SCHUTZ ELEKTRISCHER WANDLER VOR EXPLOSION UND BRAND[2008/31]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTION AND PROTECTION OF ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMER AGAINST EXPLOSION AND FIRE[2008/31]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PREVENTION ET DE PROTECTION D'UN TRANSFORMATEUR ELECTRIQUE CONTRE L'EXPLOSION ET LE FEU[2008/31]
Entry into regional phase09.11.2007National basic fee paid 
09.11.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
09.11.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2007Examination requested  [2008/31]
17.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2009Observations by third parties
09.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2011Fee for grant paid
02.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sergi France/Magnier, Philippe
186 Avenue du Général de Gaulle/
1880 Treble Drive
78260 Achères/Humble, Texas 77338 / FR
Opponent's representative
de Kernier, Gabriel
Cabinet Netter Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2012/35]
Opponent(s)01  17.07.2012  26.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Sergi France
186 Avenue du Général de Gaulle
78260 Achères / FR
Opponent's representative
de Kernier, Gabriel
Cabinet Netter Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 36, avenue Hoche
75008 Paris / FR
27.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.03.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.05.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition25.06.2015Appeal received No.  T1319/15
28.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
18.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
02.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipLU13.04.2013
MC30.04.2013
CY13.04.2018
[2019/08]
Former [2018/11]LU13.04.2013
MC30.04.2013
Former [2017/49]LU13.04.2013
MC30.04.2013
CY13.04.2017
Former [2017/11]LU13.04.2013
MC30.04.2013
CY13.04.2016
Former [2015/34]LU13.04.2013
MC30.04.2013
Former [2014/01]MC30.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[DA]US5946171  (MAGNIER PHILIPPE [FR]) [DA] 1,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB693448  (BRITISH ELECTRIC TRANSFORMER C) [A] 1,8 * figure 1; claims 1,6 *;
 [A]US2639308  (JEAN EGGER LEON) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 18 - line 48 * * column 2, line 14 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0238475  (ELIN UNION AG [AT]) [A] 1,8 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]LV12029  (BALTARUTA SIA [LV]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]US6456095  (SORITA TETSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 2, line 45 - line 64 * * figures 1,7-,9 * * column 14, line 35 - line 40 *;
 [A]US2005223782  (DOHI MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS58218106  (HOUKI YASUMICHI) [A] 1,8 * abstract *
 [A]  - (A) ROLIKS JURIJS - (B) JURIJS ROL IKS ÄLVÜ, "Ellas transformatoru temperaturas kontroles iekarta", EPODOC, (19000101), Database accession no. LV12029 A, XP002430306 [A] 1,8 * column A *
by applicantWO9712379
 IN189089
 US6804092
otherIN189089
    - DARCHERIF A-M. ET AL, "Modelisation Magneto-Thermo-Hydrodynamique dans une cuve de transformateur de puissance Optimisation d'un systeme de prevention contre l'explosion des transformateurs", 5E CONFÉRENCE FRANCOPHONE DE MODÉLISATION ET SIMULATION - MOSIM '04, (20040901), pages 1 - 8, XP003023361
    - DARCHERIF M. ET AL, "Development of a Magneto-Thermo.Hydrodynamic Model and design of a transformer, on load tap changer and bushing oil cable box, explosion and fire prevention", IEEE MEXICO SECTION, (19990711), pages 1 - 6, XP003023362
    - PRIGENT S. ET AL, "Comparison of the sergi developed magneto-thermo-hydrodynamic model results with measurements made on a 160KVA Transformer", IEEE SECTION MEXICO, (20000529), pages 1 - 5, XP003023363
    - ANONYMOUS, "Transformer, Failures and consequences SERGI type3000 Transformer, On load tap changer and bushing oil cable box Blast and Fire Prevention", MAGAZINEEN01, (19970926), pages 1 - 4, XP003023364
    - "Tranformer Constrcutin", HEATHCOTE M.J., The J&P Transformer Book, NEWNES, (1998), ISBN 0750611588, XP003023365
    - CULVER B. ET AL, "Prevention of Tank rupture of faulted power transformers by generator circuit breakers", ETEP, (199601), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 39 - 45, XP003023366