Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1944056

EP1944056 - MYOCARDIAL ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.11.2011
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.12.2011  [2011/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JMS Co., Ltd.
12-17, Kakomachi,Naka-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 730-8652 / JP
[2008/29]
Inventor(s)01 / TANABE, Hiroaki
8-6-505, Yonban-cho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 102-0081 / JP
02 / HAYASHI, Shuro
C/O JMS CO., LTD., 12-17, Kakomachi, Naka-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 7308652 / JP
 [2008/42]
Former [2008/29]01 / TANABE, Hiroaki
7-3-23-301, Roppongi, Minato-ku
Tokyo 1060032 / JP
02 / HAYASHI, Shuro
C/O JMS CO., LTD., 12-17, Kakomachi, Naka-ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 7308652 / JP
Representative(s)Zinnecker, Armin , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/29]Zinnecker, Armin , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwähe -Patentanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06810514.725.09.2006
[2008/29]
WO2006JP318946
Priority number, dateJP2005027763526.09.2005         Original published format: JP 2005277635
[2008/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007034938
Date:29.03.2007
Language:JA
[2007/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1944056
Date:16.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP29.03.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05, A61N1/39
[2008/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/29]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MYOKARDIALE ELEKTRODE[2008/29]
English:MYOCARDIAL ELECTRODE[2008/29]
French:ÉLECTRODE MYOCARDIQUE[2008/29]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2008Translation filed 
25.04.2008National basic fee paid 
25.04.2008Search fee paid 
25.04.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/29]
11.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/52]
08.08.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003163184  (SCHEINER AVRAM [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7 * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0108]; figures 3-5,11-13 *;
 [A]US6296630  (ALTMAN PETER A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003139794  (JENNEY CHRISTOPHER R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *