Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025337

EP2025337 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR EXTERNAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/08]EXTERNAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION
[2014/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.07.2015
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD.
2-5, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8236 / JP
For all designated states
Pola Pharma Inc.
8-9-5, Nishigotanda Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
[2014/35]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD.
2-5, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8236 / JP
For all designated states
Pola Pharma Inc.
8-9-5, Nishi-gotanda Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIKI, Toyohiko
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO
560, Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
02 / NOZAWA, Akira
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO
560, Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
03 / KUBOTA, Nobuo
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO
560, Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
04 / TOMIYAMA, Susumu
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO
560, Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
05 / KOBAYASHI, Hirokazu
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC.
TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO
560, Kashio-cho
Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
 [2014/37]
Former [2009/08]01 / MIKI, Toyohiko
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC. TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO 560, Kashio-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
02 / NOZAWA, Akira
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC. TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO 560, Kashio-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
03 / KUBOTA, Nobuo
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC. TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO 560, Kashio-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
04 / TOMIYAMA, Susumu
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC. TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO 560, Kashio-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
05 / KOBAYASHI, Hirokazu
c/o POLA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES INC. TOTSUKA-KENKYUSHO 560, Kashio-cho Totsuka-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-0812 / JP
Representative(s)Thurston, Joanna , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2014/37]
Former [2010/43]Westwood, Joanna , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2009/08]Bannerman, David Gardner , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date06811053.502.10.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006JP319705
Priority number, dateJP2006006207808.03.2006         Original published format: JP 2006062078
JP2006021590408.08.2006         Original published format: JP 2006215904
[2009/08]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007102241
Date:13.09.2007
Language:JA
[2007/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025337
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025337
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP13.09.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/4178, A61K31/19, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/22, A61P31/10
[2014/09]
Former International [2009/08]A61K31/4178, A61K47/10, A61K47/12, A61K47/14, A61K47/22, A61P31/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR ÄUssEREN ANWENDUNG[2014/37]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR EXTERNAL USE[2014/37]
French:COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE À USAGE EXTERNE[2014/37]
Former [2009/08]TOPISCHE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Former [2009/08]EXTERNAL PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION
Former [2009/08]COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE EXTERNE
Entry into regional phase06.10.2008Translation filed 
06.10.2008National basic fee paid 
06.10.2008Search fee paid 
06.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
08.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.07.2014Fee for grant paid
21.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2012
Opposition(s)11.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.10.2006
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE02.10.2014
LU02.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU02.10.2006
AT10.09.2014
BE10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
TR10.09.2014
IE02.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2016/25]AT10.09.2014
BG10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE02.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SI10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE02.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/46]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
IE02.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
IT10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/34]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
DK10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/33]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/32]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
MC10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
BE31.10.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT10.09.2014
CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
PL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY10.09.2014
CZ10.09.2014
EE10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
SK10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
IS10.01.2015
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
RO10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
PT12.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
NL10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
LV10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY10.09.2014
ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
GR11.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES10.09.2014
FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
Former [2015/09]FI10.09.2014
LT10.09.2014
SE10.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT10.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1537868  (POLA CHEM IND INC [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * table 1 and 2; claim 1, 8, 17 *;
 [Y]WO2004084826  (NEXMED HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 5; page 4, line 19-21; page 7, line 7-12 *;
 [Y]FR2844197  (GALDERMA RES & DEV [FR]) [Y] 4 * page 12, line 5-14 *