Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2070585

EP2070585 - METHOD OF OPERATING MEMBRANE SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.11.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, TR
published on 10.08.2016  [2016/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation
1-105, Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
[2014/01]
Former [2009/25]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Chemicals Corporation
1-105 Kanda Jinbocho Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-8101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TSUKAHARA, Takashi
c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
1-2, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8440 / JP
02 / MORI, Yoshihiko
c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
1-2, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8440 / JP
 [2014/01]
Former [2009/25]01 / TSUKAHARA, Takashi
c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-2, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8440 / JP
02 / MORI, Yoshihiko
c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-2, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8440 / JP
Representative(s)Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
[2014/01]
Former [2009/25]Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner
Maximilianstrasse 54
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date06811103.803.10.2006
[2009/25]
WO2006JP319755
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008041320
Date:10.04.2008
Language:JA
[2008/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2070585
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2070585
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP10.04.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B01D65/02, C02F1/44, B01D61/22
[2011/20]
Former International [2009/25]B01D65/02, C02F1/44
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES MEMBRANABSCHEIDERS[2009/25]
English:METHOD OF OPERATING MEMBRANE SEPARATOR[2009/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN SÉPARATEUR À MEMBRANE[2009/25]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2009Translation filed 
22.04.2009National basic fee paid 
22.04.2009Search fee paid 
22.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/25]
03.05.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2013Fee for grant paid
18.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.05.2011
Opposition(s)02.10.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.10.2006
AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
IT01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
TR01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
[2016/32]
Former [2016/29]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
IT01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
GR02.04.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2016/25]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
BG01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/27]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
MC01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2015/24]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SI01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/50]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
PL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
SK01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/49]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
RO01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
CZ01.01.2014
DK01.01.2014
EE01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT01.01.2014
BE01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
LV01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/39]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
NL01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT01.01.2014
CY01.01.2014
ES01.01.2014
FI01.01.2014
LT01.01.2014
SE01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
PT02.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT01.01.2014
IS01.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2005082498  (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA]; ADAMS NICHOLAS WILLIAM HARCSAR [CA]; SIN) [X] 1,3,4,6 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0068]; figures 1,5-15 * * paragraph [0042]; figure 3 * [I] 2,5;
 [X]WO03013706  (US FILTER WASTEWATER GROUP INC [US]; ZHA FUFANG [AU]; STUBBS ANTHONY J) [X] 1,4,6 * figure 2 *