Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1952633

EP1952633 - METHOD OF CONNECTING TO INTERNET VIA BROADCAST RECEIVING DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.05.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2008/32]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / JUN, Goo
333-601 Cheongmyeongmaeul 3-danji, Byucksan Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-737 / KR
 [2008/32]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Robinson, Ian Michael , et al
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date06812274.627.10.2006
[2008/32]
WO2006KR04434
Priority number, dateKR2005010382001.11.2005         Original published format: KR 20050103820
[2008/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007052923
Date:10.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1952633
Date:06.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2007
[2008/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR10.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/173
[2008/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM VERBINDEN MIT DEM INTERNET ÜBER EINE AUSSTRAHLUNGSEMPFANGSEINRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2008/32]
English:METHOD OF CONNECTING TO INTERNET VIA BROADCAST RECEIVING DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR THE SAME[2008/32]
French:PROCEDE DE CONNEXION A INTERNET VIA UN DISPOSITIF DE RECEPTION DE RADIODIFFUSION ET UN APPAREIL ASSOCIE[2008/32]
Entry into regional phase28.05.2008National basic fee paid 
28.05.2008Search fee paid 
28.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/32]
31.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
05.01.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination05.03.2015Appeal received No.  T1029/15
01.05.2015Statement of grounds filed
03.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP15158232.7  / EP2897359
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
15.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
25.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
24.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
23.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9963759  (IMAGICTV INC [CA]; CAMERON ALLAN [CA]; POMEROY TRENTON [CA]; ALSTON DA) [X] 1,4,5,7-10,13,14,16,19,20,22-25,28,29 * page 6, ll. 22 - 30; page 9, l. 4 - page 10, l. 25; page 15, ll. 9 - 27;;; figures 1-3, 8 * [Y] 2,3,6,11,12,15,17,18,21,26,27,30;
 [Y]US2003033607  (SCHWALB EDDIE M [US]) [Y] 2,3,6,11,12,15,17,18,21,26,27,30 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051]; figure 10 *;
 [A]US5895462  (TOKI YASUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-30 * column 16, line 33 - column 18, line 45; figures 26-31 *;
 [A]WO0156225  (VIACLIX INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * page 1, ll. 29 - 34; page 2, l. 25 - page 3, l. 8; page 10, l. 21 - page 11, l. 21;;; figures 2, 3A *
International search[Y]KR20020040265  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]);
 [Y]KR20000038389  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD);
 [Y]WO2004038538  (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO2004077768  (SONY ELECTRONICS INC [US], et al)
by applicantWO9963759