Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1931689

EP1931689 - Pharmaceutical-grade ferric citrate for medical use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2008/25]PHARMACEUTICAL-GRADE FERRIC ORGANIC COMPOUNDS, USES THEREOF AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME
[2013/30]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.07.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
19.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panion & BF Biotech Inc.
16F, No. 3
Yuanqu Street
Nangang District
Taipei / TW
[2013/13]
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
Globoasia LLC
11427 Potomac Oaks Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHAN, Keith
11427 Potomac Oaks Drive
Rockville, MD 20850 / US
02 / TOWN, Winston
331 Tai Hang Road, 1st Floor
Hong Kong / HK
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)Watkins, Charlotte Helen
Secerna LLP The Catalyst
Baird Lane
Heslington East
York YO10 5GA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/09]Capasso, Olga , et al
De Simone & Partners S.p.A.
Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20
00198 Roma / IT
Former [2008/25]Capasso, Olga , et al
De Simone & Partners S.p.A. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20
00198 Roma / IT
Application number, filing date06813544.118.08.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006US32385
Priority number, dateUS2005020698118.08.2005         Original published format: US 206981
US20050709511P19.08.2005         Original published format: US 709511 P
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007022435
Date:22.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1931689
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007
[2008/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1931689
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C51/42, C07C51/41, A61K31/295, A61P13/12
[2013/25]
Former International [2008/25]C07F15/02, A01N37/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Eisencitrat in Arzneimittelqualität zur medizinischen Verwendung[2013/30]
English:Pharmaceutical-grade ferric citrate for medical use[2013/30]
French:Citrate ferrique de qualité pharmaceutique pour usage médical[2013/30]
Former [2008/25]ORGANISCHE EISENVERBINDUNGEN IN ARZNEIMITTELQUALITÄT, VERWENDUNGEN DAVON UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON
Former [2008/25]PHARMACEUTICAL-GRADE FERRIC ORGANIC COMPOUNDS, USES THEREOF AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME
Former [2008/25]COMPOSES ORGANIQUES FERRIQUES DE QUALITE PHARMACEUTIQUE AINSI QU'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DE CEUX-CI
Entry into regional phase18.03.2008National basic fee paid 
18.03.2008Search fee paid 
18.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
27.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.06.2013
10.06.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
01.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
19.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.01.2015Fee for grant paid
12.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12192822.0  / EP2594551
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.06.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  02.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2016/41]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  02.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  25.11.2015  02.12.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hexal AG
Industriestrasse 25
83607 Holzkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Altmann, Andreas, et al
Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Isartorplatz 1
80331 München / DE
26.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.07.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
27.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.07.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition27.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2359/17
06.12.2017Statement of grounds filed
19.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
PT25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
LU18.08.2015
[2018/34]
Former [2017/39]BG25.02.2015
CY25.02.2015
EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
LU18.08.2015
Former [2016/18]EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
MC25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
LU18.08.2015
Former [2016/17]EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
LU18.08.2015
Former [2016/12]EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SI25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/50]EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
PL25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/49]EE25.02.2015
LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
RO25.02.2015
SK25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/39]LT25.02.2015
LV25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/38]LT25.02.2015
IS25.06.2015
Former [2015/35]LT25.02.2015
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5753706  (HSU CHEN HSING [US]) [XD] 1-3,5-11,13-15 * column 9, lines 53-56 * * column 2, lines 54-65 * * column 1, paragraph 1 *
International search[X]US5753706  ;
 [X]US6903235
Examination   - HSU C H ET AL, "New phosphate binding agents: Ferric compounds", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEPHROLOGY 199906 US, (199906), vol. 10, no. 6, ISSN 1046-6673, pages 1274 - 1280
    - WADA SHIN-ICHIRO ET AL, "Formation and properties of hydroxy iron(III) oligomer-citrate complex", SOIL SCIENCE AND PLANT NUTRITION, (199909), vol. 45, no. 3, ISSN 0038-0768, pages 725 - 728
OppositionUS2006020026  * ) *
    - "Keryx announces positive final results from Phase 2 dose-ranging study of Zerenex? for the treatment of hyperphos- phatemia in patients with end-stage renal disease", Keryx Press Release, (20060629), XP055377101
    - YANG et al., "An open-label, crossover study of a new phosphate-binding agent in haemodialysis patients: ferric citrate", Nephrol. Dial. Transplant., (20020000), vol. 17, pages 265 - 270, XP055023585