Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2024821

EP2024821 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SELF-ADAPTING USER INTERFACE BASED ON HARDWARE CAPABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.01.2010
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.03.2010  [2010/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG
St. Martin-Str. 76
81541 München / DE
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / PERNG, Shyan-Ming
334 West Goethe Street
Chicago, Illinois 60610 / US
02 / DRAKE, Edward C.
9239 NE 174th Place
Bothell, Washington 98011 / US
03 / WALD, Hans E.
13129 NE 139th Street
Kirkland, Washington 98034 / US
 [2009/08]
Application number, filing date06814668.714.09.2006
[2009/08]
WO2006US35879
Priority number, dateUS20060801713P19.05.2006         Original published format: US 801713 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007136397
Date:29.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/48]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2024821
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE SELBSTANPASSENDE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE AUF DER BASIS VON HARDWAREFÄHIGKEIT[2009/08]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SELF-ADAPTING USER INTERFACE BASED ON HARDWARE CAPABILITY[2009/08]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUTO-ADAPTATION D'UNE INTERFACE UTILISATEUR EN FONCTION DE CAPACITÉS MATÉRIELLES[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.01.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
24.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/09]
14.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03067427  (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 10 *;
 [A]US2005172235  (CRAGUN BRIAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] *;
 [A]US2002054174  (ABBOTT KENNETH H [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO03017077  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0209429  (EYEBALL COM NETWORK INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 25 *;
 [A]US2005182855  (APOSTOLOPOULOS JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *