Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1928772

EP1928772 - A PACK OF WIPES WITH ENHANCED DISPENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2011
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 17.09.2014  [2014/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/24]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARK, Erwin Paul, Dr.
Unter den Tannen 39
65760 Eschborn / DE
02 / HOERNER, Thomas, Wilhelm
Schloss Strasse 12
D-65719 Hofheim / DE
03 / KUPNESKI, Michael, Joseph
5705 Richmond Drive
Mason, Ohio 45040 / US
04 / JUERGENS, Stanley, George
1667 Fellsmere Ln
Cincinnati, Ohio 45224 / US
 [2008/24]
Representative(s)L'Huillier, Florent Charles , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]L'Huillier, Florent Charles , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2008/24]L'Huillier, Florent Charles , et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Rusham Park Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Application number, filing date06814756.015.09.2006
[2008/24]
WO2006US36068
Priority number, dateUS20050718030P16.09.2005         Original published format: US 718030 P
US2006051528101.09.2006         Original published format: US 515281
[2008/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007035502
Date:29.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1928772
Date:11.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2007
[2008/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1928772
Date:31.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:B65H45/24, B65D83/08
[2008/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:WISCHTUCHPACKUNG MIT VERBESSERTER AUSGABE[2008/24]
English:A PACK OF WIPES WITH ENHANCED DISPENSING[2008/24]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE SERVIETTES EN PAQUET[2008/24]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2008National basic fee paid 
21.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/24]
08.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2010Fee for grant paid
11.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
GR31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
LU15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
HU01.10.2010
[2014/38]
Former [2013/42]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
BG30.06.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
LU15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/47]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
TR31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
LU15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/44]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
LU15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/42]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
HU01.10.2010
Former [2012/41]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
BG31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/36]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
IE15.09.2010
CH30.09.2010
LI30.09.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/20]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
MC30.09.2010
Former [2011/18]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
IT31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/09]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
DK31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
PT02.08.2010
Former [2011/05]AT31.03.2010
BE31.03.2010
CY31.03.2010
CZ31.03.2010
EE31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
RO31.03.2010
SE31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
SK31.03.2010
ES12.07.2010
IS31.07.2010
Former [2010/45]AT31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
NL31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
Former [2010/42]AT31.03.2010
FI31.03.2010
LT31.03.2010
LV31.03.2010
PL31.03.2010
SI31.03.2010
Cited inInternational search[XY]US6202845  (HILL SIMON D J [DE]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 7, line 33 - line 51; figures 2,4a,4b * [Y] 3-5,7-10;
 [Y]US2002096533  (AMUNDSON JOHN DAVID [GB] ET AL) [Y] 3,7,9 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0048]; figure 29 *;
 [Y]US6550634  (ALEGRE DE MIQUEL MARITA [DE] ET AL) [Y] 8,10 * column 8, lines 46,47 *;
 [Y]US5540332  (KOPACZ THOMAS J [US] ET AL) [Y] 4,5 * abstract *;
 [A]US5516001  (MUCKENFUHS DELMAR R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *