Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1928529 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1928529



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 169
10.12.2019 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
06.12.2019 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
06.12.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
06.12.2019 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.04.2018 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.04.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 5
28.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
28.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 11
28.12.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
28.12.2015 Description Search / examination 11
28.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.12.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
25.11.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
17.11.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.07.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
01.04.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
26.04.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.04.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
26.04.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
07.12.2010 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
19.11.2010 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.11.2010 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.11.2010 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 3
24.09.2010 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
31.08.2010 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 4
02.07.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
02.07.2010 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
25.05.2010 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
14.05.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
24.04.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
02.04.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
26.03.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
15.02.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
21.06.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
21.06.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
03.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
12.04.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 31