Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1928529


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.09.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.04.2016 Change - representative
04.01.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.11.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.09.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.07.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
10.07.2015 First examination report
17.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.09.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
06.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.05.2011 Amendment by applicant
19.11.2010 Supplementary search report published on  22.12.2010  [2010/51]
19.11.2010 Change - classification published on  22.12.2010  [2010/51]
17.09.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.10.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.06.2008  [2008/24]
09.05.2008 Request for examination filed published on  11.06.2008  [2008/24]
17.04.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
27.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
09.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
09.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2006 PCT data prior to European publication