Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1928529

EP1928529 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF A BREATHING PATTERN OF A PATIENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.01.2016
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEW YORK UNIVERSITY
70 Washington Square North
New York, NY 10012 / US
[2008/24]
Inventor(s)01 / RAPOPORT, David, M.
214 West 17th Street
New York, NY 10011 / US
02 / NORMAN, Robert, G.
618 Shore Drive
New Windsor, NY 12553 / US
 [2008/24]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/24]Kopf, Korbinian Paul
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date06815008.520.09.2006
[2008/24]
WO2006US36594
Priority number, dateUS2005024019730.09.2005         Original published format: US 240197
[2008/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007040988
Date:12.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1928529
Date:11.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007
[2008/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.06.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:A61M16/00, A61B5/08, A61B5/087, G06N3/02, G06F19/00
[2010/51]
Former International [2008/24]A61M16/00, A61B5/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/24]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG EINES ATEMMUSTERS EINES PATIENTEN[2008/24]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF A BREATHING PATTERN OF A PATIENT[2008/24]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT D'UN MODE DE RESPIRATION D'UN PATIENT[2008/24]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2008National basic fee paid 
26.03.2008Search fee paid 
26.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/24]
26.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1371384  (WEINMANN G GERAETE MED [DE]) [X] 15-19 * abstract * * column 2, lines 15-25 * * column 3, lines 25-29 * * column 4, lines 40-45 *;
 [I]WO2005018416  (UNIV NEW YORK [US], et al) [I] 15-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0228281  (BREAS MEDICAL AB [SE], et al) [A] 15-19 * the whole document *
International search[X]US6845773  (BERTHON-JONES MICHAEL [AU], et al);
 [A]US6770037  (SULLIVAN COLIN EDWARD [AU], et al);
 [A]US6427689  (ESTES MARK C [US], et al)
by applicantEP1371384
 WO2005018416