Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1945835

EP1945835 - PLATINUM ELECTRODE SURFACE COATING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Second Sight Medical Products, Inc.
12744 San Fernando Road
Building 3
Sylmar, CA 91342 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]For all designated states
Second Sight Medical Products, Inc.
12744 San Fernando Road, Building 3
Sylmar, CA 91342 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZHOU, Dao, Min
29042 Discovery Ridge Drive
Saugus, CA 91390 / US
 [2008/30]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Carter, Stephen John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2008/30]Carter, Stephen John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date06815176.021.09.2006
[2008/30]
WO2006US36966
Priority number, dateUS2005025982226.10.2005         Original published format: US 259822
[2008/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007050212
Date:03.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1945835
Date:23.07.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007
[2008/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1945835
Date:25.12.2013
Language:EN
[2013/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:C25D3/50, A61N1/05
[2008/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/30]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:OBERFLÄCHENBESCHICHTUNG FÜR PLATINELEKTRODE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2008/30]
English:PLATINUM ELECTRODE SURFACE COATING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME[2008/30]
French:REVÊTEMENT DE SURFACE D'ÉLECTRODE DE PLATINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT[2013/32]
Former [2008/30]REVETEMENT DE SURFACE D'ELECTRODE DE PLATINE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT
Entry into regional phase22.05.2008National basic fee paid 
22.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/30]
09.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
21.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2013Fee for grant paid
06.11.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.09.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.09.2014  02.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Pixium Vision SA
Institut de la Vision
13, rue Moreau
75012 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Graf von Stosch, Andreas
Graf von Stosch
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2014/45]
Opponent(s)01  25.09.2014  02.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Pixium Vision SA
Institut de la Vision
13, rue Moreau
75012 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Graf von Stosch, Andreas
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
03.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
13.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.11.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition23.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0193/17
21.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
28.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
21.09.2012Request for further processing filed
21.09.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.10.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
08.07.2009Request for further processing filed
08.07.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.07.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
21.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200803   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2009
30.09.201106   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2011
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.09.2006
AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
TR25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE21.09.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU21.09.2006
AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE21.09.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/29]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
IT25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE21.09.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/28]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
GR26.03.2014
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE21.09.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2016/25]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
BG25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE21.09.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/37]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
IE21.09.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/33]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU21.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
Former [2015/24]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SI25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU21.09.2014
Former [2015/22]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
LU21.09.2014
Former [2015/20]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
MC25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/48]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
DK25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/39]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
NL25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/37]AT25.12.2013
BE25.12.2013
CY25.12.2013
CZ25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
ES25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
PL25.12.2013
RO25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
SK25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
PT28.04.2014
Former [2014/36]BE25.12.2013
EE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
IS25.04.2014
Former [2014/34]BE25.12.2013
FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/25]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
LV25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/22]FI25.12.2013
LT25.12.2013
SE25.12.2013
Former [2014/20]LT25.12.2013
Cited inInternational search[DXY]US2003192784  (ZHOU DAO MIN [US]) [DX] 1,2,6,8-10,13-26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0012] , [0027] , [0028] , [0031] , [0032] , [0034] , [0036] , [0038] , [0045] * [Y] 27,28;
 [DXAY]US2003233134  (GREENBERG ROBERT J [US], et al) [DX] 18-26 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0017] , [0019] , [0020] * * claims 1-6,47,49 * * paragraphs [0077] , [0078] , [0091] , [0096] - [0100] * [A] 1,6,13-17 [Y] 27,28;
 [XA]WO2004029611  (KIM HEE-CHAN [KR], et al) [X] 24 * page 5, lines 10-17 * * page 6, lines 16-24 * * page 9; example 1 * [A] 1,3-5,16-18;
 [XA]US3532556  (STEELE RAYMOND) [X] 24 * examples 18-23 * [A] 1-23