Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1933899

EP1933899 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LEUKOREDUCTION OF RED BLOOD CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.09.2011
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CaridianBCT, Inc.
10811 West Collins Avenue
Lakewood, CO 80215 / US
[2008/39]
Former [2008/26]For all designated states
Gambro BCT, Inc.
10811 West Collins Avenue
Lakewood, CO 80215 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GIBBS, Bruce
8425 Wright Street
Arvada, Colorado 80005 / US
 [2008/26]
Representative(s)Roberts, Mark Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/26]Roberts, Mark Peter
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date06816420.105.10.2006
[2008/26]
WO2006US39153
Priority number, dateUS20050596591P05.10.2005         Original published format: US 596591 P
[2008/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007041716
Date:12.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1933899
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007
[2008/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/36, A61M1/38
[2008/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT FÜR DIE LEUKOREDUKTION VON ROTEN BLUTKÖRPERCHEN[2008/26]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR LEUKOREDUCTION OF RED BLOOD CELLS[2008/26]
French:MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL POUR LA LEUCORÉDUCTION DE GLOBULES ROUGES[2008/26]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2008National basic fee paid 
17.01.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/26]
23.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/44]
06.07.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:25.06.2009
[2009/36]
Cited inInternational search[A]US2003106861  (GIBBS BRUCE M [US] ET AL) [A] 20-22 * paragraphs [0048] - [0057] * * paragraph [0071] * * figures 1-8,10-13 *;
 [A]US6053856  (HLAVINKA DENNIS [US]) [A] 20-22 * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 67 * * column 16, line 49 - column 17, line 37 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US2004079707  (SMITH KELLY B [US] ET AL) [A] 20-22 * paragraphs [0104] - [0110] *;
 [A]US4464167  (SCHOENDORFER DONALD W [US] ET AL) [A] 20-22 * figure 3 *;
 [A]WO9846362  (OMEGA MEDICINTEKNIK AB [SE]; UNGER PETER [SE]; WESTBERG ERIC [SE]) [A] 20-22 * page 7, lines 4-35 *