Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1935205

EP1935205 - USER TERMINAL-INITIATED HARD HANDOFF FROM A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK TO A CELLULAR NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2008/26]
Inventor(s)01 / RIMONI, Yoram
24 Wallenberg
34990 Haifa / IL
02 / YACOBI, Eitan
Yahalom 33a Street
30900 Zichron-ya'akov / IL
 [2008/26]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Catesby, Olivia Joanne , et al
Tomkins & Co.
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2008/26]Gates, Marie Christina Esther , et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date06816916.812.10.2006
[2008/26]
WO2006US40164
Priority number, dateUS2005024998412.10.2005         Original published format: US 249984
[2008/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007047477
Date:26.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1935205
Date:25.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007
[2008/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1935205
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.04.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/30, // H04L5/00, H04L12/54, H04M15/00, H04W36/14, H04W36/18, H04W36/36, H04W88/06, H04W40/20, H04W48/06
[2015/48]
Former International [2008/26]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/18]
Former [2008/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VON EINEM BENUTZERENDGERÄT INITIIERTE, HARTE ÜBERGABE VON EINEM WLAN ZU EINEM MOBILFUNKNETZ[2008/26]
English:USER TERMINAL-INITIATED HARD HANDOFF FROM A WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORK TO A CELLULAR NETWORK[2008/26]
French:TRANSFERT A DISCONTINUITE ( HARD ) A L'INITIATIVE D'UN TERMINAL UTILISATEUR DEPUIS UN RESEAU LOCAL SANS FIL VERS UN RESEAU CELLULAIRE[2008/26]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2008National basic fee paid 
12.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/26]
21.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.03.2016Fee for grant paid
16.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2015
Opposition(s)07.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
05.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
07.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.10.2006
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
[2018/38]
Former [2018/33]HU12.10.2006
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/29]HU12.10.2006
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU12.10.2006
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE12.10.2016
LU12.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/40]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
LU12.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
SE04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
Former [2016/49]FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
Former [2016/46]LT04.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003134638  (SUNDAR RANGAMANI [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0105] * * figures 8,29,30 *;
 [X]US2005059400  (JAGADEESAN RAMANATHAN T [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8-14,17,18,21 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0051] * * figure 3 *;
 [A]US2004146021  (FORS CHAD M [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005192009  (SHAHEEN KAMEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *