blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1965658 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1965658



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1732
17.07.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
17.07.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
15.07.2019 Request for documents Opposition 1
05.07.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
26.06.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 100
26.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
20.12.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
14.12.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
15.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
06.09.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
15.08.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
15.08.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
15.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.04.2018 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
17.04.2018 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
16.04.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
12.04.2018 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
12.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 3
12.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 3
12.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 57
12.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 57
12.04.2018 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 28
09.04.2018 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.03.2018 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
12.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.03.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.03.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
08.03.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
08.03.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.03.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 Description Search / examination 35
27.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.02.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
14.12.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
14.12.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
14.12.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.12.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
17.11.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.11.2017 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
15.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
09.11.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 9
09.11.2017 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.11.2017 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.10.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.08.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2017 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
17.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
17.07.2017 Claims Search / examination 2
17.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
17.07.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
06.06.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.06.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
31.05.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.05.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
08.05.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
03.05.2017 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 11
27.04.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
18.04.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
10.04.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
10.04.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
31.03.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
24.03.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.03.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.03.2017 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
02.02.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
30.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.01.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
16.11.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 38
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
07.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
07.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
07.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
31.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
18.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.10.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
26.09.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
23.09.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
22.09.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.09.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
16.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
14.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
13.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
11.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
07.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
05.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
05.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
01.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 10
01.09.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
01.09.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
31.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 11
30.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
30.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
29.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
26.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 19
26.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
25.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
23.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
22.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 9
22.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
21.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
20.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
20.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
20.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
20.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
20.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
19.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
19.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
18.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
18.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
18.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 17
18.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
17.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
17.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
16.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
16.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
16.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
16.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
16.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
13.08.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
13.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
12.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
12.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
12.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
12.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
12.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
11.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
11.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
11.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
11.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
11.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
10.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
10.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
10.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
10.08.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Annex Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
08.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
07.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
06.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
06.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 21
05.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
05.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
05.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
05.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
04.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
04.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
04.08.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
02.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
01.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
01.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
01.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
01.08.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
30.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
30.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
30.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
30.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 21
29.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 20
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 29
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 12
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 30
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
27.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 35
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 29
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
26.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 5
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
25.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
24.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
24.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
23.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 4
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 3
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
22.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 2
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
21.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 1
20.07.2016 Observations by third parties Search / examination 17
25.05.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.05.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.05.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 87
18.04.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.07.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 3
13.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
07.05.2013 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.04.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.04.2013 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
13.02.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.12.2012 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.06.2012 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 6
06.06.2012 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 5
13.03.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.03.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.03.2012 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
25.01.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.01.2012 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
28.11.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.08.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.07.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
20.06.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2008 Annex Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 8
20.06.2008 Sequence listing Search / examination 37
17.06.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.06.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
17.06.2008 Fax request to enter the European phase Search / examination 8
17.06.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.06.2008 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.06.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 18
28.03.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.12.2007 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.06.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 105
24.05.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 7
24.05.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 67
24.05.2007 Sequence listing Search / examination 28