blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1965658


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
30.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.10.2019  [2019/40]
09.08.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
16.07.2019 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
05.07.2019 Opposition filed published on  07.08.2019  [2019/32]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
17.12.2018 Change - representative
31.08.2018 (Expected) grant published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
18.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.04.2018 New entry: Observations by third parties
22.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.03.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
09.03.2018 Change - applicant published on  11.04.2018  [2018/15]
06.03.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
15.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2017 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.07.2017 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
21.07.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.07.2017 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
21.07.2017 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
07.05.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
31.01.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.10.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.09.2016 First examination report
19.09.2016 New entry: Observations by third parties
03.08.2016 New entry: Observations by third parties
25.07.2016 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.07.2016 New entry: Observations by third parties
25.05.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.04.2016 Change - classification published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
22.04.2016 Change - classification published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2014 Change - applicant published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
20.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.05.2013 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
26.04.2013 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
26.04.2013 Amendment by applicant
26.04.2013 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
12.02.2013 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
16.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
01.06.2012 Supplementary search report published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
01.06.2012 Change - classification published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
01.06.2012 Change - classification published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
17.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.09.2008  [2008/37]
08.08.2008 Request for examination filed published on  10.09.2008  [2008/37]
30.07.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.2008 Amendment by applicant
23.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
30.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication