Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1965658

EP1965658 - FEEDSTUFFS FOR AQUACULTURE COMPRISING STEARIDONIC ACID FEEDSTUFFS FOR AQUACULTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, MC, RO
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Black Mountain Science and Innovation Park
Clunies Ross Street
Acton ACT 2601 / AU
[2018/15]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
Former [2008/37]For all designated states
Commonwealth Scientific and Industrial Research Organisation
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
For all designated states
University of Tasmania
Hobart, TAS 7000 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Matthew, Robert
3 Bonnington Road
West Hobart, Tasmania 7000 / AU
02 / CARTER, Christopher, Guy
24 Allison Avenue
Riverside, Tasmania 7250 / AU
03 / NICHOLS, Peter, David
14 Gourlay Street
West Hobart, Tasmania 7000 / AU
04 / SINGH, Surinder, Pal
10 Lucas Place
Downer, Australian Capital Territory 2602 / AU
05 / ZHOU, Xue-Rong
53 Heydon Cresent
Evatt, Australian Capital Territory 2617 / AU
06 / GREEN, Allan, Graham
6-53 Elimatta Street
Braddon, Australian Capital Territory 2612 / AU
 [2008/37]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/40]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
Former [2008/37]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date06817510.817.11.2006
[2008/37]
WO2006AU01737
Priority number, dateUS20050737946P18.11.2005         Original published format: US 737946 P
[2008/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007056823
Date:24.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1965658
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2007
[2008/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1965658
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU24.05.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2012
ClassificationInternational:A23K20/158, A23K50/80
[2016/21]
Former International [2012/27]A23K1/00, A01K61/00, C12N15/29, A01H1/04, A01K67/027, C12N15/30, A01H1/06, C12N15/11, C12N15/52, A01H5/00, C12N15/12, A23K1/16, A23K1/18, C12P7/64, A01K61/02
Former International [2008/37]A23K1/00, A01K61/00, C12N15/29, A01H1/04, A01K67/027, C12N15/30, A01H1/06, C12N15/11, C12N15/52, A01H5/00, C12N15/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/40]
Former [2008/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUTTERMITTEL FÜR DIE AQUAKULTUR, DIE STEARIDONSÄURE FUTTERMITTEL FÜR DIE AQUAKULTUR ENTHALTEN[2008/37]
English:FEEDSTUFFS FOR AQUACULTURE COMPRISING STEARIDONIC ACID FEEDSTUFFS FOR AQUACULTURE[2008/37]
French:ALIMENTS POUR AQUACULTURE COMPRENANT DES ALIMENTS À BASE D'ACIDE STÉARIDONIQUE POUR AQUACULTURE[2008/37]
Entry into regional phase17.06.2008National basic fee paid 
17.06.2008Search fee paid 
17.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/37]
22.04.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.07.2016Observations by third parties
01.08.2016Observations by third parties
20.08.2016Observations by third parties
26.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
17.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2018
08.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
12.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.04.2018Observations by third parties
12.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2018Fee for grant paid
15.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2016
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.06.2019   
"Keine Patente auf Saatgut!" e.V.
Frohschammerstr. 14
80807 München / DE
 [2019/32]
17.07.2019Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.07.2017Request for further processing filed
17.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.07.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.04.2013Request for further processing filed
22.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.05.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
EE03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
MC03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RO03.10.2018
LU17.11.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/34]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
LU17.11.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/26]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]LT03.10.2018
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[YA]WO02092073  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES BOULDER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * claims 1,29,8 * [A] 3,4,7;
 [YA]WO2005021761  (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * claims 29,44,45 * [A] 3,4,7
 [XY]  - "Culture of Atlantic cod (Gadus morhua) juveniles and Arctic char (Salvelinus alpinus) on diets containing Echium oil: effects on fish health and immune function", Good, Joanne Elizabeth, Replacement of dietary fish oil with vegetable oils: effects on fish health, University of Stirling, (2004), pages 264 - 304, XP002676377 [X] 1-5,7 * page 274 - page 282; tables 7.3,7.4 * * page 289 * [Y] 1,2,5,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/1893/2005
 [XA]  - BAYIR A ET AL, "Fatty acid composition in some selected marine fish species living in Turkish waters", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, WILEY & SONS, CHICHESTER, GB, (20050905), vol. 86, doi:10.1002/JSFA.2295, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 163 - 168, XP003013214 [X] 3,4,7 * tables 2,4 * [A] 1,2,5,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.2295
 [XA]  - PHLEGER C F ET AL, "Interannual and between species comparison of the lipids, fatty acids and sterols of Antarctic Krill from the US AMLR Elephant Island survey area", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY. PART B, BIOCHEMISTRYAND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER,OXFORD, GB, (20020101), vol. 131, doi:10.1016/S1096-4959(02)00021-0, ISSN 1096-4959, pages 733 - 747, XP003013218 [X] 4,7 * table 3 * [A] 1-3,5,6

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1096-4959(02)00021-0
International search[X]WO03099216  (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al);
 [X]WO02092073  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES BOULDER CORP [US], et al);
 [X]WO2005021761  (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al);
 [X]WO2005102310  (MONSANTO TECHNOLOGY LLC [US], et al);
 [A]WO02092540  (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES BOULDER CORP [US], et al);
 [A]WO2006028839  (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al);
 [X]  - PHLEGER C.F. ET AL., "Lipids and nutrition of the southern rock lobster, Jasus edwardsii, from hatch to puerulus", MARINE FRESHWATER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 52, pages 1475 - 1486, XP008130732
 [A]  - OPSAHL-FERSTAD H.-G. ET AL., "Biotechnological approaches to modify rapeseed oil composition for application in aquaculture", PLANT SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 165, pages 349 - 357, XP003013213

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9452(03)00345-5
 [XP]  - MILLER M.R. ET AL., "Regiospecificity profiles of storage and membranes lipids from the gill and muscle tissue of Atlantic Salmon (Salmo salar L.) grown at elevated temperature", LIPIDS, (2006), vol. 41, no. 9, pages 865 - 876, XP008130730
 [XP]  - BAYIR A. ET AL., "Fatty acid composition in some selected marine fish species living in Turkish waters", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (2006), vol. 86, pages 163 - 168, XP003013214

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.2295
 [X]  - KIESSLING A. ET AL., "Effects of reduced feed ration levels on fat content and fatty acid composition in white and red muscle from Rainbow Trout", AQUACULTURE, (1989), vol. 79, no. 1-4, pages 169 - 175, XP003013215

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0044-8486(89)90458-4
 [X]  - NJINKOUE J.-M. ET AL., "Lipids and fatty acids in muscle, liver and skin of three edible fish from the Senegalese Coast: Sardinella maderensis, Sardinella aurita and Cephalopholis taeniops", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY PART B, (2002), vol. 131, pages 395 - 402, XP003013216

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1096-4959(01)00506-1
 [X]  - BELL J.G. ET AL., "Substituting fish oil with crude palm oil in the diet of Atlantic Salmon (Salmo salar) affects muscle fatty acid composition and hepatic fatty acid metabolism", THE JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (2002), vol. 132, pages 222 - 230, XP003013217
 [X]  - PHLEGER C.F. ET AL., "Interannual and between species comparison of the lipids, fatty acids and sterols of Antarctic Krill from the US AMLR Elephant Island survey area", COMPARATIVE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY PART B, (2002), vol. 131, pages 733 - 747, XP003013218

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1096-4959(02)00021-0
 [A]  - KIM J.D. ET AL., "Effects of Dietary Lipid to protein Ratios on the Fatty Acid Composition of Muscle Lipids in rainbow Trout", NUTRITION REPORTS INTERNATIONAL, (1989), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 9 - 16, XP008130735
 [A]  - NORDGARDEN U. ET AL., "Seasonally Changing Metabolism in Atlantic Salmon (Salmo salar L.) II - beta-oxidation Capacity and Fatty Acid Composition in Muscle Tissues and Plasma Lipoproteins", AQUACULTURE NUTRITION, (2003), vol. 9, pages 295 - 303, XP003013219

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2095.2003.00260.x
 [A]  - HALILOGLU H.I. ET AL., "Comparison of fatty acid acid composition in some tissues of Rainbow Trout (Oncorhynchus mykiss) living in seawater and freshwater", FOOD CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 86, pages 55 - 59, XP003013220

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.foodchem.2003.08.028
 [X]  - YANG X. ET AL., "Dietary alpha-Linolenic and linoleic acids competitively affect metabolism of polyunsaturated fatty acids in Arctic Charr (Salvelinus alpinus)", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1994), vol. 124, no. 7, pages 1133 - 1145, XP008018947
 [X]  - SAITO H. ET AL., "High levels of n-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids in Euphausia pacifica and its role as a source of docosahexaenoic and icosapentaenoic acids for higher trophic levels", MARINE CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 78, pages 9 - 28, XP003013221

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0304-4203(02)00005-1
 [X]  - BELL J.G. ET AL., "Effects of diets rich in linoleic (18:2n-6) and alpha-linolenic (18:3n-3) acids on the growth, lipid class and fatty acid compositions and eicosanoid production in juvenile turbot (Scophthalmus maximus L.)", FISH PHYSIOLOGY AND BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 105 - 118, XP008018949
 [X]  - LUZZANA U. ET AL., "Seasonal variations in fat content and fatty acid composition of male and female coregonid "bondella" from Lake Maggiore and landlocked shad from lake Como (Northern Italy)", JOURNAL OF FISH BIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 48, pages 352 - 366, XP008126875

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1095-8649.1996.tb01433.x
 [X]  - ARAS N.M. ET AL., "Comparison of fatty acid profiled of different tissues of mature trout (Salmo trutta labrax, Pallas 1811) caught from Kazandere creek in the Coruh region, Erzurum, Turkey", TURKISH JOURNAL OF VETERINARY AND ANIMAL SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 23, pages 311 - 316, XP003013222
 [X]  - GONZALEZ-FELIX M.L. ET AL., "Nutritional evaluation of fatty acids for the open thelycum shrimp, Litopenaeus vannamei: II. Effect of dietary n-3 and n-6 polyunsaturated and highly unsaturated fatty acids on juvenile shrimp growth, survival, and fatty acid composition", AQUACULTURE NUTRITION, (2003), vol. 9, pages 115 - 122, XP003013223

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2095.2003.00232.x
 [X]  - ABBADI A. ET AL., "Biosynthesis of very-long-chain polyunsaturated fatty acids in transgenic oilseeds: constraints on their accumulation", PLANT CELL, (2004), vol. 16, pages 2734 - 2748, XP002334261

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.104.026070
 [X]  - HONG H. ET AL., "High-level production of gamma-linolenic acid in Brassica juncea using a delta6 desaturase from Pythium irregulare", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 129, pages 354 - 362, XP002207405

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1104/pp.001495
 [X]  - URSIN V.M. ET AL., "Modification of plant lipids for human health: development of functional land based omega-3 fatty acids", JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (2003), vol. 133, pages 4271 - 4274, XP001182921
 [X]  - SATO S. ET AL., "Production of gamma-linolenic acid and stearidonic acid in seeds of marker-free transgenic soybean", CROP SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 44, pages 646 - 652, XP003013225
 [A]  - SAYANOVA O. ET AL., "Accumulation of delta6-unsaturated fatty acids in transgenic tobacco plants expression a delta6-desaturase from Borago officinalis", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, (1999), vol. 50, no. 340, pages 1647 - 1652, XP003013224

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jexbot/50.340.1647
Examination   - Anonymous, "feedstuff - Definition from the Merriam-Webster Online Dictionary", (20090424), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20090424031405/http://www.merriam-webster.com/dictionary/feedstuff, (20160823), XP055296977
    - Cathryn E Wood, "Premarket Notification for a New Dietary Ingredient, Echium oil", (20020101), URL: http://www.fda.gov/ohrms/dockets/dockets/95s0316/95s-0316-rpt0147-03-vol105.pdf, (20160824), XP055297210
    - Virginia M Ursin, "Symposium: Improving Human Nutrition through Genomics, Proteomics and Biotechnologies Modification of Plant Lipids for Human Health: Development of Functional Land-Based Omega-3 Fatty Acids 1", The Journal of Nutrition, (20030411), vol. 133, pages 4271 - 4274, XP055294701
    - I.P FORSTER ET AL, "Rendered meat and bone meals as ingredients of diets for shrimp Litopenaeus vannamei (Boone, 1931)", AQUACULTURE, Amsterdam, NL, (20030401), vol. 219, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/S0044-8486(02)00457-X, ISSN 0044-8486, pages 655 - 670, XP055297151

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0044-8486(02)00457-X
    - CAROLE BLANCHET ET AL, "Fatty acid composition of wild and farmed Atlantic salmon (Salmo salar) and rainbow trout (Oncorhynchus mykiss)", LIPIDS, (20050501), vol. 40, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s11745-005-1414-0, pages 529 - 531, XP055297138

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11745-005-1414-0
    - Carole Blanchet ET AL, "ANALYSES DES ACIDES GRAS OMÉGA-3 ET DES CONTAMINANTS ENVIRONNEMENTAUX DANS LES SALMONIDÉS RAPPORT FINAL", (20050201), URL: https://www.mapaq.gouv.qc.ca/fr/Publications/RapportSalmonides.pdf, (20160824), XP055297218
    - J Gordon Bell ET AL, "Nutrient Requirements Substituting Fish Oil with Crude Palm Oil in the Diet of Atlantic Salmon (Salmo salar) Affects Muscle Fatty Acid Composition and Hepatic Fatty Acid Metabolism", Journal of nutrition, (20020101), pages 222 - 230, XP055266640
otherEP0196565