Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1960065

EP1960065 - ROLLER SKATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): BG
published on 16.10.2013  [2013/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abel, Helmut
11 bis, Av. Edouard VII
78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
[2010/18]
Former [2008/35]For all designated states
Abel, Helmut
11 bis Av Edouard VII
78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DEHAESELEER, Olivia
11 bis, av. Edouard VII
F-78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
02 / ABEL, Céline
11 bis, av. Edouard VII
F-78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
03 / ABEL, Diane
11 bis, av. Edouard VII
F-78600 Maisons-Laffitte / FR
 [2008/35]
Representative(s)Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/50]Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner
Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [2008/35]Westphal, Klaus
Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Former [2008/32]Westphal, Klaus
Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5
78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE
Application number, filing date06818631.117.11.2006
[2008/35]
WO2006EP11059
Priority number, dateDE2005105906908.12.2005         Original published format: DE102005059069
[2008/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007065553
Date:14.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1960065
Date:27.08.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2007
[2008/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1960065
Date:05.05.2010
Language:DE
[2010/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:A63C17/06
[2008/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/35]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ROLLSCHUH[2008/35]
English:ROLLER SKATE[2008/35]
French:PATIN A ROULETTES[2008/35]
Entry into regional phase17.12.2007National basic fee paid 
17.12.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/35]
14.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2010Fee for grant paid
19.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
BG05.08.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
LU17.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2012/47]BG05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
TR05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
LU17.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2012/44]BG05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
LU17.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2012/42]BG05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
HU06.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2012/41]BG05.05.2010
CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/33]CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/18]CZ05.05.2010
DK05.05.2010
EE05.05.2010
FI05.05.2010
IE05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
RO05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
SK05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
PT06.09.2010
Former [2011/05]FI05.05.2010
LT05.05.2010
LV05.05.2010
PL05.05.2010
SE05.05.2010
SI05.05.2010
CY02.06.2010
GR06.08.2010
IS05.09.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003057665  (MATNEY EDDIE N [US]) [X] 1,3,8 * paragraphs [0014] , [0017] , [0023]; figures 1A-4B *;
 [A]US2002125658  (ALWARID ALI [CA]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0080]; figure 16 *;
 [A]WO2004110574  (JEON IN [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US6070885  (FERONE RALPH J [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9904871  (LOVITT BERT [US], et al) [A] 1,3,4,7 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5951028
 US6723437
 US6443464
 WO02068070
 US6070885