Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1977124

EP1977124 - DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND POSITIONING IMPLEMENTS, WORKPIECES AND TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Drees, Jürgen
Emil-Reinert-Strasse 11
57636 Mammelzen / DE
[2008/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2008/41]
Representative(s)Aue, Hans-Peter
Patentanwälte
Becker & Aue
Tannenring 79
65207 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Aue, Hans-Peter
Patentanwalt, Tannenring 79
65207 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date06819036.216.12.2006
[2008/41]
WO2006EP12151
Priority number, dateDE20062000908U19.01.2006         Original published format: DE 202006000908 U
DE20062016392U26.10.2006         Original published format: DE 202006016392 U
[2008/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007082577
Date:26.07.2007
Language:DE
[2007/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1977124
Date:08.10.2008
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007
[2008/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1977124
Date:25.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/09]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2007
ClassificationInternational:F16C11/10
[2008/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/41]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN UND POSITIONIEREN VON GERÄTEN, WERKSTÜCKEN UND WERKZEUGEN[2008/41]
English:DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND POSITIONING IMPLEMENTS, WORKPIECES AND TOOLS[2008/41]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR MAINTENIR ET POSITIONNER DES APPAREILS, DES PIÈCES ET DES OUTILS[2008/41]
Entry into regional phase30.07.2008National basic fee paid 
30.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
30.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.2007Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/41]
01.12.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2009Fee for grant paid
05.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY25.02.2009
DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/33]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
HU26.08.2009
Former [2011/05]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
GR26.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/15]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
BG25.05.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Former [2010/04]DK25.02.2009
EE25.02.2009
FI25.02.2009
IE25.02.2009
LT25.02.2009
LV25.02.2009
RO25.02.2009
IS25.06.2009
PT12.08.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]US5118058  (RICHTER GARY L [US]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2003039506  (CHEN CHANG HUI [TW]) [A] 1-18 * figures 1-3 *