Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020982

EP2020982 - PACIFYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2011
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.07.2011  [2011/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Goodwin, David
Goodwin Product Design, Barn House Warren Lane
Pyrford, Surrey GU22 8XD / GB
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Copsey, Timothy Graham , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Copsey, Timothy Graham , et al
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06820352.027.11.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006GB04416
Priority number, dateGB2005002404025.11.2005         Original published format: GB 0524040
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007060460
Date:31.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020982
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.05.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61J17/00
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BERUHIGUNGSGERÄT[2009/07]
English:PACIFYING APPARATUS[2009/07]
French:SUCETTE BÉBÉ[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2008National basic fee paid 
25.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.06.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
16.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/30]
07.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.08.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
13.10.2008Request for further processing filed
13.10.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
13.10.2008Request for further processing filed
13.10.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200803   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2009
30.11.200904   M06   Fee paid on   28.05.2010
30.11.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2005216060  (MCCARTY READ [US]) [X] 1,2,20,21,24,25 * paragraphs [0021] , [0024]; figure - * [Y] 26;
 [X]DE9216374U  (FRONING, CLAUDIA, 5810 WITTEN, DE) [X] 1,20,21,24 * the whole document *;
 [X]US3987142  (HURST ERIC KENNETH) [X] 1-7,20,24 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US4676386  (PHLAPHONGPHANICH VICHAI [TH]) [Y] 26 * column 2, line 47 - line 56; figure - *