Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1955403

EP1955403 - MICROWAVE POWER SPLITTER / COMBINER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.01.2011
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LEONARDO MW LTD
Christopher Martin Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB
[2016/47]
Former [2013/24]For all designated states
SELEX ES LTD
Christopher Martin Road
Basildon, Essex SS14 3EL / GB
Former [2010/09]For all designated states
Selex GALILEO Limited
Christopher Martin Road Basildon
Essex SS14 3EL / GB
Former [2008/33]For all designated states
Selex Sensors and Airborne Systems Limited
Christopher Martin Road Basildon
Essex SS14 3EL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PANAGHISTON, Gary David
West Hanningfield Road Great Baddow Chelmsford
Essex CM2 8HN / GB
 [2008/33]
Representative(s)Tolfree, Adam Joseph Benjamin , et al
Leonardo MW Ltd
c/o Impetus IP Limited
Suite 31, West Devon Business Park
Brook Lane
Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/32]Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor , et al
SELEX GALILEO LIMITED
c/o Impetus IP Limited
Suite 31
West Devon Business Park, Brook Lane, Tavistock
Devon PL19 9DP / GB
Former [2012/27](deleted)
...
Former [2010/09]Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor , et al
Selex GALILEO Limited c/o Impetus IP Limited Suite 57a Basepoint Business Park Caxton Close, Andover
Hampshire SP10 3FG / GB
Former [2008/33]Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor
c/o Impetus IP Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham
Basingstoke Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB
Application number, filing date06820646.529.11.2006
[2008/33]
WO2006GB50419
Priority number, dateGB2005002437030.11.2005         Original published format: GB 0524370
EP2006027001309.02.2006         Original published format: EP 06270013
[2008/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007063344
Date:07.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1955403
Date:13.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007
[2008/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01P5/16, H01P11/00
[2008/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/33]
TitleGerman:MIKROWELLEN-LEISTUNGSTEILER/-KOMBINIERER[2008/33]
English:MICROWAVE POWER SPLITTER / COMBINER[2008/33]
French:DIVISEUR / COMBINATEUR DE PUISSANCE HYPERFREQUENCE[2008/33]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2008National basic fee paid 
09.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2008Examination requested  [2008/33]
02.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2013Date of oral proceedings
31.10.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination14.01.2014Appeal received No.  T0735/14
14.03.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
01.07.2009Request for further processing filed
01.07.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.07.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004061568  (ISHIDA KAORU ET AL) [X] 1,15 * paragraphs [0075] - [0080]; figure 5 *;
 [A]EP0735605  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION) [A] 1,15 * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 28; figure 4A *;
 [A]JP2005044955  ;
 [A]EP1087460  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; figures 1,2 *
 [XY]  - TSUNEO TOKUMITSU ET AL, "MULTILAYER MMIC USING A 3 UMXN-LAYER DIELECTRIC FILM STRUCTURE", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS, ELECTRONICS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (19920601), vol. E75-C, no. 6, ISSN 0916-8524, pages 698 - 706, XP000310897 [X] 1,9-12,15 * page 703, column R, line 9 - page 704, column R, line 5; figures 7,14-16 * [Y] 2,4,16
 [Y]  - CHENG P L ET AL, "Quantitative analysis of resistance variations in as-deposited nickel-phosphorus (NiP) embedded resistors", 2003 PROCEEDINGS 53RD. ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. (ECTC). NEW ORLEANS, LA, MAY 27 - 30, 2003, PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030527), vol. CONF. 53, ISBN 0-7803-7991-5, pages 156 - 160, XP010647665 [Y] 2 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ECTC.2003.1216271
 [Y]  - KAUTIO ET AL., "20 GHZ WILKINSON POWER DIVIDERS IN LTCC TECHNOLOGY", VTT ELECTRONICS, (2004), pages 38 - 39, XP002378136 [Y] 4,16 * page 39, column L, lines 2-8; figure 2 *
 [X]  - J. KASSNET ET AL., "HIGHLY INTEGRATED POWER DISTRIBUTION NETWORKS ON MULTILAYER LTCC FOR Ka-BAND MULTIPLE-BEAM PHASED ARRAY ANTENNAS", IMAPS NORDIC CONFERENCE - PROCEEDINGS; ESPOO(FI), (20030921), pages 51 - 54, XP002378135 [X] 1,15 * page 52, column L, lines 12-17; figure 3 *
 [X]  - TAKAO HASEGAWA ET AL, "MULTI-BRANCH POWER DIVIDERS USING MULTILAYER MMIC TECHNOLOGY", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRONICS, ELECTRONICS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, (19920601), vol. E75-C, no. 6, ISSN 0916-8524, pages 707 - 712, XP000310898 [X] 1,15 * page 707, column R, line 14 - page 708, column R, line 1; figures 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005044955 A 20050217 (ORIENT MICRO WAVE:KK) [A] 1 * abstract *