Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1955403 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1955403



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 256
08.03.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
16.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.04.2014 F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name Appeal 1
03.04.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.03.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
14.03.2014 Claims Appeal 3
14.03.2014 Claims Appeal 3
14.03.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
14.03.2014 Description Appeal 3
14.03.2014 Description Appeal 3
14.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 4
14.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.11.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
04.11.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
04.11.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.11.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
04.11.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
04.11.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
31.10.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 1
31.10.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
31.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
31.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
31.10.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.09.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
19.09.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
19.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 3
19.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
19.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.09.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
13.05.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.05.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
26.03.2013 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Notice drawing attention to increase of renewal fee Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.03.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
20.03.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.02.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
27.06.2012 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.05.2012 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
25.01.2011 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
31.12.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
31.12.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
22.10.2010 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.07.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.07.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.03.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.03.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.02.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.01.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 3
25.01.2010 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 3
17.07.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
01.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 4
01.07.2009 Description Search / examination 4
01.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.2009 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.01.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.01.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.09.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
02.09.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.07.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
08.07.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
18.06.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
09.05.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.05.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
11.04.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.11.2007 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
25.06.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 24
25.06.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
07.06.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
07.06.2007 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
22.03.2007 Document concerning representation International Searching Authority 1
29.11.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
29.11.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 3
29.11.2006 Description International Searching Authority 10
29.11.2006 Drawings International Searching Authority 6