Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1955403


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.12.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.11.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2018 Change - representative
29.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2016 Change - applicant published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
18.10.2016 Change - representative
27.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.04.2014 Change: Appeal number
19.03.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal
15.01.2014 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
15.01.2014 New entry: Appeal number
03.12.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2013 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
30.10.2013 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
10.05.2013 Change - applicant published on  12.06.2013  [2013/24]
15.03.2013 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
27.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.07.2012 Change - representative published on  08.08.2012  [2012/32]
29.06.2012 Change - extension states published on  01.08.2012  [2012/31]
01.06.2012 Change - representative published on  04.07.2012  [2012/27]
29.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2011 New entry: Decision on request for further processing
14.01.2011 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
14.01.2011 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
11.01.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
26.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.10.2010 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.07.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
02.03.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.01.2010 Change - applicant published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
29.01.2010 Change - representative published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
01.12.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2009 New entry: Receipt of request for further processing
10.07.2009 New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing
03.07.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.04.2009 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
07.01.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.08.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.08.2008 First examination report
11.07.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
11.07.2008 Request for examination filed published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
17.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
28.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
27.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
04.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
09.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
14.02.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication