Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1965783

EP1965783 - TREATMENT OF TYPE 2 DIABETES WITH A COMBINATION OF DPIV INHIBITOR AND METFORMIN OR THIAZOLIDINEDIONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Royalty Pharma Collection Trust
Rodney Square North
1100 North Market Street
Wilmington DE 19890 / US
[2012/07]
Former [2011/38]For all designated states
Royalty Pharma Finance Trust
Rodney Square North
1100 North Market Street
Wilmington DE 19890 / US
Former [2008/37]For all designated states
Prosidion Limited
Windrush Court Watlington Road
Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / RACHMAN, Jonathan
Prosidion Limited
Windrush Court Watlington Road
Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB
 [2013/25]
Former [2008/37]01 / RACHMAN, Jonathan
Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road
Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2011/38]Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2011/26]Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline , et al
Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford
OX4 6LT / GB
Former [2010/38]Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2008/37]Blakey, Alison Jane
Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road
Oxford OX4 6LT / GB
Application number, filing date06820700.022.12.2006
[2008/37]
WO2006GB50475
Priority number, dateGB2005002629123.12.2005         Original published format: GB 0526291
[2008/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007072083
Date:28.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1965783
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007
[2008/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1965783
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/155, A61K31/426, A61K31/4439, A61P3/10
[2008/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/37]
Extension statesAL23.07.2008
BA23.07.2008
HR23.07.2008
MK23.07.2008
RS23.07.2008
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES TYP 2 MIT EINER KOMBINATION AUS DPIV-HEMMER UND METFORMIN ODER THIAZOLIDINDION[2008/37]
English:TREATMENT OF TYPE 2 DIABETES WITH A COMBINATION OF DPIV INHIBITOR AND METFORMIN OR THIAZOLIDINEDIONE[2008/37]
French:TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE DE TYPE 2 PAR COMBINAISON D'UN INHIBITEUR DE DPIV A DE LA METFORMINE OU DE LA THIAZOLIDINEDIONE[2008/37]
Entry into regional phase23.07.2008National basic fee paid 
23.07.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
23.07.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.07.2008Examination requested  [2008/37]
06.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.02.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2013Fee for grant paid
09.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  15.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 02  19.03.2014  02.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Dr. Thorsten Bausch
Hoffmann Eitle
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [2017/36]
Former [2017/04]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  15.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Connell, Maura
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Dublin D04 F838 / IE
 02  19.03.2014  02.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Dr. Thorsten Bausch
Hoffmann Eitle
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  24.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
O'Connell, Maura
FRKelly
27 Clyde Road
Ballsbridge
Dublin 4 / IE
 02  19.03.2014  02.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Dr. Thorsten Bausch
Hoffmann Eitle
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/29]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  24.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 02  19.03.2014  02.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Dr. Thorsten Bausch
Hoffmann Eitle
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  24.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
4 George Street
Llandeilo Dyfed
SA19 6AS / GB
 02  19.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dr. Thorsten Bausch
Hoffmann Eitle
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE, et al
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014   
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
4 George Street
Llandeilo Dyfed
SA19 6AS / GB
29.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
13.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.10.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition11.12.2015Appeal received No.  T2339/15
22.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.05.2010Request for further processing filed
06.05.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005020983  (PROSIDION LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1-26 * * examples 15,16 * * page 4, paragraph 18 *;
 [A]WO0053171  (MOLTENI L E C DEI FRATELLI ALI [IT], et al) [A] 1-6,10-15 * the whole document *
 [X]  - SUZUKI M ET AL, "EFFECT OF PIOGLITAZONE IN COMBINATION WITH METFORMIN ON DIABETES AND OBESITY IN WISTAR FATTY RATS", DIABETES, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19990619), vol. 48, no. SUPPL 1, ISSN 0012-1797, page A454, XP001065260 [X] 1-6,10-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - ANONYMOUS, "Sitagliptin (MK-0431) for Type 2 Diabetes shows promise in Phase II clinical trials", (20050611), URL: http://www.medicalnewstoday.com/medicalnews.php?newsid=25962, (20070314), XP002424688 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [PY]  - ANONYMOUS, "New Phase III Data Showed Significant Glucose-Lowering Efficacy of JANUVIA(TM), an Investigational Medicine for Type 2 Diabetes, When Taken Simultaneously with Metformin", (20060914), URL: http://209.18.123.244/news/bnitem.aspx?name=5479835, (20070314), XP002424689 [PY] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [PY]  - ANONYMOUS, "Highlights of Prescribing Information: JANUVIA Tablets", (200610), URL: http://www.merck.com/product/usa/pi_circulars/j/januvia/januvia_pi.pdf, (20070314), XP002424690 [PY] 1-15 * page 2, paragraph 1.2 *
Examination   - HINKE S A ET AL, "Metformin effects on dipeptidylpeptidase IV degradation of glucagon-like peptide-1", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20020315), vol. 291, no. 5, doi:10.1006/BBRC.2002.6607, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 1302 - 1308, XP002976338

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2002.6607
    - YASUDA N ET AL, "Enhanced secretion of glucagon-like peptide 1 by biguanide compounds", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20021115), vol. 298, no. 5, doi:10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02565-2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 779 - 784, XP002976340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02565-2
    - KRENTZ ANDREW J ET AL, "ORAL ANTIDIABETIC AGENTS - CURRENT ROLE IN TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS", DRUGS : INTERNAT. JOURNAL OF CURRENT THERAPEUTICS AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY REVIEWS, FEATURING EVALUATIONS ON NEW DRUGS AND DRUG THERAPY, AND DRUG LITERATURE ABSTRACTS, WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH ADIS, AUSTRALIA, (20050101), vol. 65, no. 3, doi:10.2165/00003495-200565030-00005, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 385 - 411, XP009085446

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-200565030-00005
    - TURNER R C ET AL, "GLYCEMIC CONTROL WITH DIET, SULFONYLUREA, METFORMIN, OR INSULIN IN PATIENTS WITH TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS PROGRESSIVE REQUIREMENT FOR MULTIPLE THERAPIES (UKPDS 49)", JAMA THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, US, (19990602), vol. 281, no. 21, doi:10.1001/JAMA.281.21.2005, ISSN 0098-7484, pages 2005 - 2012, XP008011494

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1001/jama.281.21.2005
by applicantWO9740832
 WO0172290
 WO9515309
 WO9529691
 WO9818763
 WO9819998
 WO9925719
 WO9938501
 WO9946272
 WO9961431
 WO9962914
 WO9967278
 WO9967279
 WO0034241
 WO0134594
 WO0140180
 WO0155105
 WO0152825
 WO0168603
 WO0181304
 WO0181337
 WO0196295
 WO0197808
 WO0202560
 WO0208090
 WO0214271
 WO0230890
 WO0230891
 WO0238541
 WO02051836
 WO02053548
 WO02062764
 WO02066627
 WO02067918
 WO02068420
 WO02076450
 WO02083109
 WO02083128
 WO03000181
 WO03000250
 WO03002530
 WO03002531
 WO03002553
 WO03002942
 WO03003250
 WO03003727
 WO03004496
 WO03004498
 WO03104229
 WO03024965
 WO03035057
 WO03035067
 WO03033524
 WO03033671
 WO03037327
 WO03055881
 WO03057144
 WO03057200
 WO03057666
 WO03068748
 WO03068757
 WO03074500
 WO03084940
 WO03092605
 WO03101449
 WO03101958
 WO03106456
 WO2004016587
 WO2004016840
 WO2004018468
 WO2004018469
 WO2004024184
 WO2004026822
 WO2004033455
 WO2004037169
 WO2004037181
 WO2004041795
 WO2004043940
 WO2004046106
 WO2004046148
 WO2004048352
 WO2004050022
 WO2004050658
 WO2004052850
 WO2004103276
 WO2004112701
 WO2005012249
 WO2005012308
 WO2005012312
 WO2005016911
 WO2005019168
 WO2005025554
 WO2005026148
 WO2005030751
 WO2005037779
 WO2005037828
 WO2005040095
 WO2005042533
 WO2005042488
 WO2005044195
 WO2005047297
 WO2005051949
 WO2005051950
 WO2005056541
 WO2005056013
 WO2005056003
 WO2005058849
 WO2005058901
 WO2005063750
 WO2005073186
 WO2005075421
 WO2005075426
 WO2005077900
 WO2005082906
 WO2005082847
 WO2005082349
 WO2005082348
 WO2005085246
 WO2005087774
 WO2005087235
 WO2005095343
 WO2005095381
 WO2005095339
 WO2005097798
 WO2005100334
 WO2005108382
 WO2005113510
 WO2005116012
 WO2005011614
 WO2005011629
 WO2005118555
 WO2005120494
 EP1245568
 EP1258476
 EP1258480
 EP1338595
 JP2002265439
 JP2003300977
 WO03072556
    - LANCET, (1998), vol. 352, pages 837 - 853
    - DIABETES, (1995), vol. 44, pages 1249 - 1258