blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1938237 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1938237



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 616
02.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.06.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.06.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.06.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 56
28.06.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 56
17.05.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
16.05.2018 Communication about missing advise for delivery Appeal 3
30.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
11.04.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
06.04.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 10
06.04.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
01.12.2017 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
15.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
09.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 2
01.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
28.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 37
22.12.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 37
03.12.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
14.11.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 60
22.08.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 1
14.08.2013 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 2
13.08.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 4
19.02.2013 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.10.2012 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.10.2012 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
11.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
11.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
11.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 3
11.10.2012 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
11.10.2012 Claims Appeal 3
11.10.2012 Claims Appeal 3
11.10.2012 Claims Appeal 3
11.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
11.10.2012 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 20
03.08.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
03.08.2012 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.08.2012 Translation of notice of appeal Appeal 1
27.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
27.06.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
11.06.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 15
11.06.2012 Means of redress Search / examination 2
08.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
08.06.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.05.2012 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.04.2012 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
19.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 3
19.04.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2012 Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings Search / examination 14
01.03.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
27.02.2012 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
14.02.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
14.02.2012 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.02.2012 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.05.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
17.05.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.05.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
11.01.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
11.01.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
05.08.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
05.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
14.05.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
14.05.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.06.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.05.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
23.04.2008 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
08.02.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
06.02.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.02.2008 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
06.02.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
16.11.2007 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
01.11.2007 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
01.11.2007 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
23.04.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 63
05.04.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 57