Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2029853

EP2029853 - WELL DRILLING MACHINE WITH NEW DRILL PIPE LOADER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.03.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2016New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comacchio S.r.l.
Via Callalta 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (Treviso) / IT
[2009/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Comacchio, Renzo
c/o Comacchio S.r.l. Via Callalta, 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (TV) / IT
02 / Comacchio, Pasqualino
c/o Comacchio S.r.l. Via Callalta, 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (TV) / IT
03 / Comacchio, Patrizio
c/o Comacchio S.r.l. Via Callalta, 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (TV) / IT
 [2010/01]
Former [2009/10]01 / COMACCHIO, Renzo
c/o Comacchio S.r.l. Via Callalta, 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (TV) / IT
02 / COMACCHIO, Pasqualino
c/o Comacchio S.r.l. Via Callalta, 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (TV) / IT
03 / COMACCHIO, Patrizio
c/o Comacchio S.r.l. Via Callalta, 24/B
31039 Riese Pio X (TV) / IT
Representative(s)Vinci, Marcello , et al
Ufficio Veneto Brevetti Via Sorio 116
35141 Padova / IT
[2009/10]
Application number, filing date06821780.113.11.2006
[2009/10]
WO2006IT00791
Priority number, dateIT2005PD0035030.11.2005         Original published format: IT PD20050350
[2009/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007063568
Date:07.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2029853
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007
[2009/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2029853
Date:07.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.06.2007
ClassificationInternational:E21B7/02, E21B19/083, E21B19/14, E21B19/15
[2009/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRUNNENBOHRMASCHINE MIT NEUER BOHRSTANGENLADEVORRICHTUNG[2009/10]
English:WELL DRILLING MACHINE WITH NEW DRILL PIPE LOADER[2009/10]
French:MACHINE DE FORAGE DE PUITS EQUIPEE D'UNE NOUVELLE CHARGEUSE DE TIGES DE FORAGE[2009/10]
Entry into regional phase27.05.2008National basic fee paid 
27.05.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.05.2008Examination requested  [2009/10]
10.06.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.12.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.02.2010Fee for grant paid
23.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.01.2011  18.04.2016  WITHDRAWN
Casagrande SpA
Via A. Malignani
33074 Fontanafredda (PN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al
GLP S.r.l.
Viale Europa Unita, 171
33100 Udine / IT
 [2016/21]
Former [2011/07]
Opponent(s)01  05.01.2011   
Casagrande SpA
Via A. Malignani
33074 Fontanafredda (PN) / IT
Opponent's representative
Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al
GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2
33100 Udine / IT
31.01.2011No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
31.01.2011No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
11.02.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.06.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.06.2011Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02)
12.08.2011Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
20.05.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.09.2016
20.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
19.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition02.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1817/16
20.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
LT07.04.2010
LV07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
CY09.06.2010
BG07.07.2010
IS07.08.2010
HU08.10.2010
IE13.11.2010
LU13.11.2010
MC30.11.2010
[2013/42]
Former [2011/33]CZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
LT07.04.2010
LV07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
CY09.06.2010
IS07.08.2010
MC30.11.2010
Former [2011/18]CZ07.04.2010
DK07.04.2010
EE07.04.2010
LT07.04.2010
LV07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
SK07.04.2010
CY09.06.2010
IS07.08.2010
Former [2011/05]LT07.04.2010
LV07.04.2010
SI07.04.2010
CY09.06.2010
IS07.08.2010
Former [2010/42]SI07.04.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]US4604724  (SHAGINIAN ALBERT S [SU], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * column 15, line 47 - column 18, line 56; figures 1,5,6,7a,7b,8 *;
 [X]WO0055470  (KNEBEL DRILLING A S [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 11, line 25 - line 27; figure 2 *;
 [X]GB2139269  (LANE GUY ELLIOTT) [X] 1,2 * page 4, line 79 - line 93; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0984132  (CHARLES MACHINE WORKS [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9626349  (CHARLES MACHINE WORKS [US]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *;
 [A]US4708581  (ADAIR HAROLD L [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US4368602  (MANTEN HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 4-6,8,9 * the whole document *