Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1993522

EP1993522 - RESVERATROL AND/OR GRAPE LEAF EXTRACT AS I.A. ENDURANCE IMPROVER, ANTI-AGING AGENT, MUSCLE STRENGTH IMPROVER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.05.2014
Database last updated on 23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.07.2014  [2014/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao Corporation
14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho, 1-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8210 / JP
[2008/48]
Inventor(s)01 / MINEGISHI, Yoshihiko
C/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-gun
Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
02 / MURASE, Takatoshi
C/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-gun
Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
03 / HARAMIZU, Satoshi
c/o Kao Corporation Research Lab. 2606 Akabane, Ichikai-machi, haga-gun
Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
 [2011/06]
Former [2008/48]01 / MINEGISHI, Yoshihiko
C/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-gun
Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
02 / MURASE, Takatoshi
C/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 2606, Akabane, Ichikai-machi, Haga-gun
Tochigi 321-3497 / JP
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/48]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date06822740.425.10.2006
[2008/48]
WO2006JP321811
Priority number, dateJP2005031150426.10.2005         Original published format: JP 2005311504
[2008/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007049796
Date:03.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1993522
Date:26.11.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2007
[2008/48]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP21.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/05, A61K36/87, A61P3/00, A61P43/00
[2008/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/09]
Former [2008/48]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:RESVERATROL UND/ODER WEINBLATTEXTRAKT ALS AUSDAUERVERBESSERER, MITTEL GEGEN ALTERUNG UND MUSKELKRAFTVERSTÄRKER[2008/48]
English:RESVERATROL AND/OR GRAPE LEAF EXTRACT AS I.A. ENDURANCE IMPROVER, ANTI-AGING AGENT, MUSCLE STRENGTH IMPROVER[2008/48]
French:RESVERATROL ET/OU UN EXTRAIT DES FEUILLES DE VIGNE COMME RENFORCEUR D'ENDURANCE, AGENT ANTI-AGING, RENFORCEUR DE[2008/48]
Entry into regional phase13.02.2008National basic fee paid 
13.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/48]
22.08.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.10.2008Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
12.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2010Observations by third parties
22.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/27]
21.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/27]
Divisional application(s)EP11150018.7  / EP2322158
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
18.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inother   - MAHENDRA BHAUGIKA, "Santarpanam Guna", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026658
    - MADANAPALA, "Draksottha Madya Guna", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026659
    - MADANAPALA, "Draksa Panaka Guna", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026660
    - MADANAPALA, "Draksadi Yoga", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026661
    - KAIYADEVA, "Draksa Sura", DATABASE TKDL, XP003025311
    - "Kusamandakhandah", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026662
    - "Draksasava", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026663
    - ABU ALI IBN-E-SINA, "KARM (angoor)", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026664
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Sharaab-e-maweez", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026665
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, "Dawa-e-Muqawwi", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026666
    - "Dawa-e-Inabee", DATABASE TKDL, XP003026667