Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1958198

EP1958198 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLOSING RECORDING RANGE, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLOSING RECORDING MEDIUM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING MANAGEMENT INFORMATION, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING/REPRODUCING DATA ON/FROM RECORDING MEDIUM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.05.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.06.2012  [2012/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, Yong Cheol
402-803 Jugong Apt. Byeoryang-dong
Gwacheon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 427-731 / KR
 [2008/34]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2008/34]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date06823884.904.12.2006
[2008/34]
WO2006KR05176
Priority number, dateUS20050741481P02.12.2005         Original published format: US 741481 P
US20060771031P08.02.2006         Original published format: US 771031 P
KR2006001646820.02.2006         Original published format: KR 20060016468
KR2006003763026.04.2006         Original published format: KR 20060037630
KR2006003763126.04.2006         Original published format: KR 20060037631
KR2006003949802.05.2006         Original published format: KR 20060039498
[2008/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007064177
Date:07.06.2007
Language:EN
[2007/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1958198
Date:20.08.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2007
[2008/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT07.06.2007
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:G11B20/12, G11B20/18, G11B7/00
[2011/23]
Former International [2008/34]G11B20/18, G11B7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/34]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLIESSEN DES AUFZEICHNUNGSBEREICHS, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLIESSEN EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUMS, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZEICHNEN VON VERWALTUNGSINFORMATIONEN, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFZEICHNEN/WIEDERGEBEN VON DATEN AUF/VON EINEM AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2008/34]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLOSING RECORDING RANGE, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CLOSING RECORDING MEDIUM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING MANAGEMENT INFORMATION, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RECORDING/REPRODUCING DATA ON/FROM RECORDING MEDIUM, AND RECORDING MEDIUM[2008/34]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FERMER UNE PLAGE D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FERMER UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ENREGISTRER DES INFORMATIONS DE GESTION, PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ENREGISTRER/REPRODUIRE DES DONNEES SUR OU A PARTIR D'UN SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMEN[2008/34]
Entry into regional phase27.06.2008National basic fee paid 
27.06.2008Search fee paid 
27.06.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.06.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2008Examination requested  [2008/34]
10.08.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/24]
20.01.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201106   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP1752976  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1,2,5-7,10-12,15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0113] * * paragraphs [0132] - [0134] *;
 [XP]WO2006080572  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]; ANDO HIDEO [JP]; MORITA SEIJI [JP]; TAKAZAWA KOJI [JP) [XP] 1,2,5-7,10-12,15 * page 194, line 17 - page 206, line 15 * * abstract * * page 170, line 14 - page 171, line 19 *;
 [Y]EP1548714  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0122416  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * page 11, lines 18-29 * * page 17, line 28 - page 20, line 22 *;
 [A]EP1313093  (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0019432  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]; SASAKI MIYUKI [JP]; GOTO YOSHIHO) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 US7050701  [ ] (SASAKI MIYUKI [JP] ET AL) [ ] * paragraph [0145] *;
 [A]EP1548715  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5537373  (HORIKIRI KENICHI [JP]) [A] 3,8,13 * abstract *
International search[A]WO03007296  ;
 [A]JPS6391842  ;
 [A]US5495466