Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022189

EP2022189 - WIRELESS REPEATER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEORGIA TECH RESEARCH CORPORATION
505 Tenth Street, NW
Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PINEL, Stephane
482 Deering Road
Atlanta, Georgia 30309 / US
02 / LASKAR, Joy
860 Saints Drive
Marietta, Georgia 30068 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl , et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C)
P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Seitz, Holger Fritz Karl , et al
Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. P.O. Box 3241
2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date06824734.504.05.2006
[2009/07]
WO2006US17032
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2007130033
Date:15.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022189
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2007
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.11.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/15
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRAHTLOSE REPEATER-BAUGRUPPE[2009/07]
English:WIRELESS REPEATER ASSEMBLY[2009/07]
French:ENSEMBLE RÉPÉTEUR SANS FIL[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase04.12.2008National basic fee paid 
04.12.2008Search fee paid 
04.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
12.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/29]
11.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201005   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2004139477
 [Y]US2003232595
 [Y]US2002072329
 [Y]US2005164666
 [Y]US2005166117
 [Y]US7010325