Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1931690

EP1931690 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ARRAY AND STRING LEVEL MONITORING OF A GRID-CONNECTED PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thompson Technology Industries, Inc.
863 E. Francisco Blvd., Suite A
San Rafael, CA 84901 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]For all designated states
Thompson Technology Industrie, Inc.
863 E. Francisco Blvd., Suite A
San Rafael, CA 84901 / US
Inventor(s)01 / THOMPSON, Daniel, S.
58 Broadview Drive
San Rafael, CA 94901 / US
02 / SAMPATH, Laks
700 Oakdale Avenue
Corte Madera, CA 94925 / US
03 / SHEVICK, David
34 Dolores
San Rafael, CA 94901 / US
 [2008/25]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/25]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell , et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date06825531.404.10.2006
[2008/25]
WO2006US39069
Priority number, dateUS20050732421P04.10.2005         Original published format: US 732421 P
[2008/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007041693
Date:12.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1931690
Date:18.06.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2007
[2008/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01R21/00
[2009/29]
Former International [2008/25]C07H13/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/25]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE KONTROLLE VON ARRAY- UND STRING-NIVEAU EINES AN DAS NETZ ANGESCHLOSSENEN PHOTOVOLTAGENSTROMSYSTEMS[2008/25]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ARRAY AND STRING LEVEL MONITORING OF A GRID-CONNECTED PHOTOVOLTAIC POWER SYSTEM[2008/25]
French:SYSTEME ET METHODE POUR UNE SURVEILLANCE DE NIVEAU D'AGENCEMENT ET DE CORDE D'UN SYSTEME DE PUISSANCE PHOTOVOLTAIQUE RELIE A UNE GRILLE[2008/25]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2008National basic fee paid 
31.03.2008Search fee paid 
31.03.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/25]
26.10.2009Application withdrawn by applicant  [2009/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006162772  (PRESHER GORDON E JR [US], et al)