blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Citations: EP1951676

Cited inInternational search
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0054759  [X]
 (TULARIK INC [US]) [X] 1-10 * examples 13.3,13.4,18.22-18.27; claims 10-13,40-45,48 *;
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US5141935  [X]
 (TAKENAKA MITSUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * claims 3,10; compound 31 *;
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0149974  [X]
 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-7 * claims 14-24; table 1; compounds 1.47, 1.48 *;
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0196570  [X]
 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-7 * claims 2,3; compounds 3, 8-10, 18-25 *;
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO8908654  [X]
 (PFIZER [US]) [X] 1-7 * Formula IV (page 6) and Prep. ex. 1, last compound *;
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0272914  [X]
 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]) [X] 1-7 * example 3; claim 12 *;
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[X]  - SALVADOR A ET AL, "PRELIMINARY STUDIES OF SUPERCRITICAL-FLUID CHROMATOGRAPHY ON POROUS GRAPHITIC CARBON WITH METHYLATED CYCLODEXTRIN AS CHIRAL SELECTOR", CHROMATOGRAPHIA, WIESBADEN, DE, (2001), vol. 53, no. 3/4, ISSN 0009-5893, pages 207 - 209, XP001020347 [X] 1-7 * figure 1 *
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[X]  - SAWADA YOSHIHIRO ET AL, "Synthesis and insecticidal activity of benzoheterocyclic analogues of N'-benzoyl-N-(tert-butyl)benzohydrazide. Part 1. Design of benzoheterocyclic analogues", PEST MANAGEMENT SCIENCE, WILEY & SONS, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, (2003), vol. 59, no. 1, ISSN 1526-498X, pages 25 - 35, XP002421908 [X] 1-7 * page 31, paragraph 2.2.15 *
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ps.604
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[X]  - ZHOU, YONG-GUI ET AL, "Synthesis and Highly Enantioselective Hydrogenation of Exocyclic Enamides: (Z)-3-Arylidene-4-acetyl-3,4-dihydro-2H-1,4-benzoxazines", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY , 70(5), 1679-1683 CODEN: JOCEAH; ISSN: 0022-3263, (20050802), pages 1679 - 1683, XP002445231 [X] 1-7 * table 2; compound 5E *
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo048212s
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:[X]  - COUDERT, G. ET AL, "A new synthesis of 3,4-dihydro-2H-1,4-benzoxazines using solid-liquid phase-transfer catalysis", SYNTHESIS , (7), 541-3 CODEN: SYNTBF; ISSN: 0039-7881, (1979), pages 541 - 543, XP002445232 [X] 1-7 * table 1; compounds 2F,G *
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1979-28754
Cited inExamination
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US2005101600  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US6495542  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4107303  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0530657  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0294647  
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - REES A. H., SIMON K.: "Some derivatives of 1-benzazepine", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 47, 2011, pages 1227-1230,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - AUGUSTINE R L ET AL: "Synthesis of dl-deethylibogamine", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON.; US, vol. 34, no. 4, 1 January 1969 (1969-01-01), pages 1070-1075, XP002331119, ISSN: 0022-3263, DOI: DOI:10.1021/JO01256A065
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo01256a065
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HASSNER A ET AL: "Conformation of medium sized ring amines. NMR studies of N-acyl derivatives", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 18, no. 35, 1 January 1977 (1977-01-01), pages 3023-3026, XP026615036, ISSN: 0040-4039, DOI: DOI:10.1016/S0040-4039(01)83145-2 [retrieved on 1977-01-01]
DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)83145-2
Cited inby applicant
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0182917  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0037077  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US6184215  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US6187814  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO9832444  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0049992  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0017334  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0103705  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0078972  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0054759  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4107303  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0040965  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4231938  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4444784  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4739073  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4346227  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0491226  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US5273995  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:USRE37314E  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0304063  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US5011930  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US3983140  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4448784  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4450171  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4804770  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0738510  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0363934  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US3234093  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US3485852  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US4097578  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US3847988  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:EP0100172  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US6017924  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0116108  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0116133  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0116139  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0200617  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO0216310  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US2002099096  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:US2003022868  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO03011302  
Type:Patent literature
Publication No.:WO03011824  
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - EVANS, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 889 - 895,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - GLASS, ENDOCR. REV., (1994), vol. 15, pages 391 - 407,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - LEVIN ET AL., NATURE, (1992), vol. 355, pages 359 - 361,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HEYMAN ET AL., CELL, (1992), vol. 68, pages 397 - 406,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - MANGELSDORF ET AL., CELL, (1995), vol. 83, pages 841 - 850,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - CHIANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 10918 - 10924,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - URIZAR ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, pages 39313 - 39317,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - GILBERT, EVERETT E. ET AL., J ORG. CHEM., (1965), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 1001 - 3,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - DYKER; MARKWITZ, SYNTHESIS, (1998), vol. 12, pages 1750 - 1754,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - FUKUYAMA, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1985), vol. 26, page 6291,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - PETITOU, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1988), vol. 29, page 1398,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - ORG REACTIONS, (1965), vol. 14, pages 1 - 15,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - CORBET; MIGNANI, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2006), vol. 106, no. 7, pages 2651 - 2710,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - BELLINA, SYNTHESIS, (2004), pages 2419 - 2440,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - METH. ENZYMOL, (1981), vol. 71, pages 455 - 509,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - TUCKER; CHESTERTON, J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, pages 885 - 887,
Type:Non-patent literature
Publication information:   - HOFBAUER ET AL., J. BONE MINER. RES., (1999), vol. 14, pages 1330 - 1337,