blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1951676 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1951676



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1398
11.11.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
19.07.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.06.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.06.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.06.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.06.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 20
07.06.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 20
07.06.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
08.02.2013 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
08.02.2013 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
08.02.2013 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
08.02.2013 Text intended for grant Search / examination 157
11.04.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 22
11.04.2012 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 118
11.04.2012 Claims Search / examination 20
11.04.2012 Description Search / examination 55
11.04.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.12.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
06.12.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.11.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 34
15.11.2011 Claims Search / examination 22
15.11.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2011 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
25.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
25.07.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
25.07.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.07.2011 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.07.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Claims Search / examination 1
12.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.02.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
17.12.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.12.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
14.12.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
05.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.07.2008 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.06.2008 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
04.06.2008 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
15.05.2008 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
15.05.2008 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.03.2008 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
16.01.2008 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
10.01.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
10.01.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
25.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 134
25.05.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 247
03.05.2007 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 234
27.12.2006 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
27.12.2006 Claims International Searching Authority 33
27.12.2006 Description International Searching Authority 200