blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1951676


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
24.10.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
18.07.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
23.05.2014 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.06.2014  [2014/26]
16.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.06.2014  [2014/25]
09.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2014  [2014/23]
25.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
18.04.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
28.03.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.04.2014  [2014/18]
28.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.04.2014  [2014/14]
14.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.03.2014  [2014/12]
07.02.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.03.2014  [2014/11]
31.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.03.2014  [2014/10]
24.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.02.2014  [2014/09]
17.01.2014 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2014  [2014/08]
14.06.2013 (Expected) grant published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
12.06.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.06.2013 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
08.02.2013 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.01.2013 Change - classification published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
11.01.2013 Change - classification published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
11.01.2013 Change - German title published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
11.01.2013 Change - English title published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
11.01.2013 Change - French title published on  13.02.2013  [2013/07]
16.10.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.04.2012 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.01.2012 Change - divisional application(s) published on  22.02.2012  [2012/08]
06.12.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.11.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.11.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
14.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.09.2011 Change - extension states published on  19.10.2011  [2011/42]
12.08.2011 Change - divisional application(s) published on  14.09.2011  [2011/37]
19.10.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2009 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.08.2009 First examination report
31.07.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.10.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.07.2008 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  06.08.2008  [2008/32]
04.07.2008 Request for examination filed published on  06.08.2008  [2008/32]
25.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
03.06.2008 Amendment by applicant
12.01.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
07.08.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
22.06.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2007 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.2007 PCT data prior to European publication